Dennehy v. Long Island Rail Road Company

Plaintiff: Lawrence J Dennehy
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv05473
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Long Island Rail Road Company. (Alston, Karla)
November 14, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Flynn on behalf of Lawrence J Dennehy (aty to be noticed) (Flynn, Michael)
November 12, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Long Island Rail Road Company. (Alston, Karla)
November 12, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Long Island Rail Road Company identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Other Affiliate MTA Metro-North Commuter Railroad, Other Affiliate MTA Staten Island Railway, Other Affiliate MTA Capital Construction, Other Affiliate MTA Bus Company, Other Affiliate MTA Bridges and Tunnels, Other Affiliate MTA New York City Transit for Long Island Rail Road Company. (Alston, Karla)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion for extension of time to file answer #7 is granted. Defendant Long Island Rail Road Company's answer is due 11/12/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/16/2018. (Murphy, Colleen)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Long Island Rail Road Company. (Yodice, Christopher)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in person initial conference will be held on 12/07/2018 at 11:00 A.M. in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. All counsel must attend. Plaintiff is directed to notify Defendant of this scheduling order at the time Defendant makes an appearance within this matter. Counsel are also directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 12/07/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/2/2018. (Manson, Eddie)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lawrence J Dennehy. Long Island Rail Road Company served on 10/1/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Lauriello, Valerie)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Long Island Rail Road Company. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 1, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Long Island Rail Road Company filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10764270 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Lawrence J Dennehy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Lauriello, Valerie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dennehy v. Long Island Rail Road Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence J Dennehy
Represented By: Valerie J. Lauriello
Represented By: Michael D. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Represented By: Christopher P. Yodice
Represented By: Karla R Alston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?