Philpot v. Melville House Publishing, LLC
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Defendant: Melville House Publishing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv05515
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Referring Judge: Jack B Weinstein
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 COURT ORDER ON CASE FILING. (Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 10/23/2018) (Galeano, Sonia)
October 3, 2018 FILING FEE RECEIVED $ 150.00, receipt number 4653132958 In re: #4 Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Kenton J. Hutcherson). (Davis, Kimberly)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #4 Motion for Kenton J. Hutcherson Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150.00 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee .Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 10/2/2018. (Vertus, Miriam)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Rocco, Christine)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Kenton J. Hutcherson) by Larry G. Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Davis, Kimberly)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Melville House Publishing, LLC. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 2, 2018 FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653132888 (Davis, Kimberly)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Melville House Publishing, LLC, filed by Larry G. Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Interested Persons, #3 Copyright Notice) (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philpot v. Melville House Publishing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Represented By: Kenton J. Hutcherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melville House Publishing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?