Epic Pharma LLC v. Philadelphia Truck Lines, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Epic Pharma LLC
Defendant: Philadelphia Truck Lines, Inc. and J.W. Hampton Jr. & Co. Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv05539
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
0 Judge: William F Kuntz
1 Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Discovery by Philadelphia Truck Lines, Inc.. (Wright, George)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: As discussed during the 11/13/2018 conference (see attached order for additional detail and deadlines), all discovery must be completed by 4/30/2019. On or before 5/6/2019, the Parties will file a joint status report letter confirming that discovery is complete. On or before 5/30/2019, the Parties will initiate any dispositive motions in accordance with the Individual Rules of the District Judge. On or before 6/28/2019, the Parties will file their joint Proposed Pretrial Order. A Telephone Conference is set for 2/28/2019 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Plaintiff's counsel is to organize a conference call, then phone Chambers at (718) 613-2300 with all counsel on the line. On or before 2/21/2019, the Parties will file a joint status report letter, of no more than three pages, identifying any outstanding discovery disputes. Counsel will coordinate whether a test can be conducted on the recovered materials to assess possible mitigation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/13/2018. (Quinlan, Krista)
November 13, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Initial Conference Hearing held on 11/13/2018 in Courtroom 13A South. alan Tenebaum appearing for Plaintiff. Narinder Parmar and Daniel Jaffe appearing for Defendants. See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding. (FTR Log #11:56-12:25.) (Quinlan, Krista)
November 1, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to #15 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Philadelphia Truck Lines, Inc.. (Wright, George)
November 1, 2018 Filing 18 First ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim and Affirmative Defenses by J.W. Hampton Jr. & Co. Inc.. (Jaffe, Daniel)
October 31, 2018 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philadelphia Truck Lines, Inc. (Wright, George)
October 30, 2018 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J.W. Hampton Jr. & Co. Inc. (Jaffe, Daniel)
October 30, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, First CROSSCLAIM for Indemnity, Contribution or Apportionment against Philadelphia Truck Lines, Inc. by J.W. Hampton Jr. & Co. Inc.. (Jaffe, Daniel)
October 30, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Paul Jaffe on behalf of J.W. Hampton Jr. & Co. Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Jaffe, Daniel)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 11/13/2018 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 13A South. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with Defendants' counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 11/8/2018. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference unless in an emergency. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/29/2018. (Quinlan, Krista)
October 26, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against J.W. Hampton Jr. & Co. Inc. by Philadelphia Truck Lines, Inc.. (Wright, George)
October 18, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Epic Pharma LLC. Philadelphia Truck Lines, Inc. served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Tenenbaum, Alan)
October 18, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Epic Pharma LLC. J.W. Hampton Jr. & Co. Inc. served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (Tenenbaum, Alan)
October 17, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Tenenbaum on behalf of Epic Pharma LLC (aty to be noticed) (Tenenbaum, Alan)
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Narinder S. Parmar on behalf of Philadelphia Truck Lines, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Parmar, Narinder)
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by George W. Wright on behalf of Philadelphia Truck Lines, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Wright, George)
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to J.W. Hampton Jr. & Co. Inc., Philadelphia Truck Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Davis, Kimberly)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 5, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by Epic Pharma LLC (Braginsky, Philip)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. by Epic Pharma LLC (Braginsky, Philip)
October 3, 2018 NOTICE - the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to forward a completed Civil Cover Sheet, including answers to all questions on the second page. (Williams, Erica)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against J.W. Hampton Jr. & Co. Inc., Philadelphia Truck Lines, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10775113 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Epic Pharma LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Braginsky, Philip) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/4/2018 per phone request) (Layne, Monique).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epic Pharma LLC v. Philadelphia Truck Lines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epic Pharma LLC
Represented By: Philip Braginsky
Represented By: Alan Tenenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Truck Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Narinder S. Parmar
Represented By: George W. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.W. Hampton Jr. & Co. Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Paul Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?