Morel v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Maria Morel
Defendant: Bhupendra Wagley, MD, Family Health Centers at NYU Langone F/K/A Lutheran Family Health Center, United States of America and Family Health Centers at NYU Langone
Case Number: 1:2018cv05547
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 11:00 A.M. on 2/08/2019 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. All counsel must attend. Plaintiff is directed to notify Defendant of this scheduling order at the time that Defendant makes an appearance in this matter. Counsel are also directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 2/08/2019. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 11/26/2018. (Manson, Eddie)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Morel. United States of America served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. (Silver, Perry)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Williams, Erica)
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Williams, Erica)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Williams, Erica)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re Notice (Other), Notice (Other), by Maria Morel (Silver, Perry)
October 10, 2018 ****SECOND NOTICE**** - the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to forward a completed Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions, including the **NY-E DIVISION OF BUSINESS RULE 50.1(d)(2)*** and the ***CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** sections on the second page. (Williams, Erica)
October 5, 2018 NOTICE - the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to forward a completed Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions, including the **NY-E DIVISION OF BUSINESS RULE 50.1(d)(2)*** and the ***CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** sections on the second page. (Williams, Erica)
October 3, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Williams, Erica)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Morel, Maria against United States of America, Family Health Centers at NYU Langone F/K/A Lutheran Family Health Center, Bhupendra Wagley, MD filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10775794 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Maria Morel. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Silver, Perry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morel v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bhupendra Wagley, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Health Centers at NYU Langone F/K/A Lutheran Family Health Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Health Centers at NYU Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Morel
Represented By: Perry D. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?