Togba v. Long Island RailRoad

Plaintiff: Nije Togba
Defendant: Long Island RailRoad
Undetermined: Harold S Jacobowitz
Case Number: 1:2018cv05558
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Long Island RailRoad Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03229-LDH-VMS, 1:18-cv-05558-LDH-VMS (Saltz, Brian)
November 29, 2018 Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information. Counsel filed in error the report on mediation and requested it be deleted. (Guzzi, Roseann)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The Report of Mediation entered on 11/29/2018 states that this matter has settled. Accordingly, on or before 12/14/2018, the Parties are to file a stipulation of dismissal. Additionally, on or before 12/3/2018, Plaintiff shall file a letter as to whether Plaintiff still seeks the relief sought in the application filed on 11/26/2018, or whether the application is moot in light of the settlement. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/29/2018. (Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03229-LDH-VMS, 1:18-cv-05558-LDH-VMS) (Tuffaha, Omar)
November 29, 2018 REPORT of Mediation settled. Both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to Robyn Weinstein at Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session.Mediation Report due by 12/13/2018. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03229-LDH-VMS, 1:18-cv-05558-LDH-VMS (Weinstein, Robyn)
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 First MOTION for pre motion conference to sever plaintiff's FRSA action and to Reference this action only as trial ready by Nije Togba. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03229-LDH-VMS, 1:18-cv-05558-LDH-VMS (Sokoloff, Mark)
November 5, 2018 Filing 12 SELECTION OF MEDIATOR Harold S Jacobowitz and Harold S Jacobowitz selected as Mediator. The first mediation session will take place on 11/27/2018 - TBD. Fourteen days on or before the session date, counsel shall file with the Mediator their client's mediation statement summarizing the facts, legal issues, particulars of any prior settlement discussions, and the name and title of the client or client representative with full settlement authority who will attend the mediation in person. Attendance in person is required of the trial attorney, insurance adjuster, and client or client representative with full settlement authority. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned to Robyn Weinstein, ADR Administrator, Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov or fax (718) 613-2333. Contact information for the Mediator is on the docket sheet. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to Robyn Weinstein at Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session.Report of Mediation due by 12/11/2018. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03229-LDH-VMS, 1:18-cv-05558-LDH-VMS (Saltz, Brian)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation shall be completed by 12/10/2018. Selection of Mediator due by 11/8/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/25/2018. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-03229-LDH-VMS, 1:18-cv-05558-LDH-VMS (Quinlan, Krista)
October 24, 2018 Case Consolidated. (Quinlan, Krista)
October 24, 2018 Cases associated. (Quinlan, Krista)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: As discussed during the 10/24/2018 conference (see attached order for additional detail and deadlines), all discovery must be completed by 2/28/2019. On or before 2/28/2019, the Parties will file a joint status report letter confirming that discovery is complete. The 12/11/2018 conference is cancelled. The 11/13/2018 conference is also cancelled in 18CV5558. Counsel will submit a letter proposing dates for a settlement conference with the Court. The parties made an oral motion for consolidation for trial. In consultation with the District Judge, the motion is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/24/2018. (Quinlan, Krista)
October 24, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Status Conference held on 10/24/2018 in Courtroom 13A South. Mark Sokoloff appearing for Plaintiff. Brian Saltz appearing for Defendant. See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding. (FTR Log #11:23-11:43.) (Quinlan, Krista)
October 24, 2018 Filing 10 Letter requesting inclusion in mediation program by Long Island RailRoad (Saltz, Brian)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: Counsel should be prepared to discuss this case at the 10/24/2018 Status Conference in Togba v. Long Island RailRoad (18 Civ. 2229), which involves the same parties and counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/23/2018. (Tuffaha, Omar)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 11/13/2018 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 13A South. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with Defendant's counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 11/8/2018. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference unless in an emergency. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/23/2018. (Quinlan, Krista)
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Long Island RailRoad. (Saltz, Brian)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon for all further proceedings. Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis, Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 10/22/2018. (Williams, Erica)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Related Case. (Williams, Erica)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Long Island RailRoad. (Williams, Erica)
October 12, 2018 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Williams, Erica) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/12/2018) (Williams, Erica). (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/12/2018) (Williams, Erica).
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Williams, Erica)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Nije Togba (Sokoloff, Mark)
October 10, 2018 ****SECOND NOTICE**** -the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to forward a completed Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions, including the **NY-E DIVISION OF BUSINESS RULE 50.1(d)(2)*** and the ***CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** sections on the second page. (Williams, Erica)
October 5, 2018 NOTICE - the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to forward a completed Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions, including the **NY-E DIVISION OF BUSINESS RULE 50.1(d)(2)*** and the ***CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** sections on the second page. (Williams, Erica)
October 4, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Williams, Erica)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Nije Togba (Sokoloff, Mark)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Long Island RailRoad filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10777458 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Nije Togba. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sokoloff, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Togba v. Long Island RailRoad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island RailRoad
Represented By: Brian Kenneth Saltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nije Togba
Represented By: Mark G. Sokoloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Harold S Jacobowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?