Kathy Wu v. Sannino's Bella Vita Vineyard LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kathy Wu
Defendant: SANNINO VINEYARD B B INC, SANNINO'S BELLA VITA VINEYARD LLC and Sannino Vineyard B and B Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv05673
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for defendants Sannino Vineyard B and B Inc., and Sannino's Bella Vita Vineyard LLC., to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to December 21, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 11/30/2018. (Riquelme, Claudia)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with the consent of Plaintiff, up to and including December 21, 2018 by Sannino Vineyard B and B Inc., Sannino's Bella Vita Vineyard LLC. (Sverdlov, Samuel)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Sverdlov on behalf of Sannino Vineyard B and B Inc., Sannino's Bella Vita Vineyard LLC (aty to be noticed) (Sverdlov, Samuel)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathy Wu. Sannino's Bella Vita Vineyard LLC served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Marks, Bradly)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathy Wu. Sannino Vineyard B and B Inc. served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Marks, Bradly)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sannino Vineyard B and B Inc., Sannino's Bella Vita Vineyard LLC. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 15, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SANNINO VINEYARD B B INC, SANNINO'S BELLA VITA VINEYARD LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10815691 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Kathy Wu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Marks, Bradly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kathy Wu v. Sannino's Bella Vita Vineyard LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Wu
Represented By: Bradly Gurion Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANNINO VINEYARD B B INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANNINO'S BELLA VITA VINEYARD LLC
Represented By: Samuel Sverdlov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sannino Vineyard B and B Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Sverdlov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?