Allen v. TFP1 Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tre Allen
Defendant: John DiBattista and TFP1 Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv05812
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 754
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tre Allen. John DiBattista waiver sent on 10/17/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Stevens, Brittany)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tre Allen. TFP1 Inc. waiver sent on 10/17/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Stevens, Brittany)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to John DiBattista, TFP1 Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 18, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Yusha D. Hiraman on behalf of Tre Allen (aty to be noticed) (Hiraman, Yusha)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John DiBattista, TFP1 Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10846868 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Tre Allen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Stevens, Brittany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. TFP1 Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John DiBattista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TFP1 Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tre Allen
Represented By: Yusha D. Hiraman
Represented By: Brittany Alexandra Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?