Value Wholesale, Inc. v. KB Insurance Co. Ltd

Plaintiff: Value Wholesale, Inc.
Defendant: KB Insurance Co. Ltd d/b/a Kookmin Best Insurance Company (US Branch) f/k/a Leading Insurance Group Insurance Co., Ltd. and KB Insurance Co., Ltd
Case Number: 1:2018cv05887
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
0 Judge: Steven M Gold
1 Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Value Wholesale, Inc.. KB Insurance Co., Ltd served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Schurin, Richard)
October 25, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to KB Insurance Co., Ltd. (Williams, Erica)
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Williams, Erica)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Williams, Erica)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Value Wholesale, Inc. (Schurin, Richard)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Stern on behalf of Value Wholesale, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Stern, Steven)
October 23, 2018 NOTICE - the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to forward a completed Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions, including the ***CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page. (Williams, Erica)
October 22, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Williams, Erica)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint,, by Value Wholesale, Inc. (Schurin, Richard)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by Value Wholesale, Inc. (Schurin, Richard)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KB Insurance Co. Ltd d/b/a Kookmin Best Insurance Company (US Branch) f/k/a Leading Insurance Group Insurance Co., Ltd. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10859497 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Value Wholesale, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Insurance Policy 1, #2 Exhibit A1 - Insurance Policy 2, #3 Exhibit B - Initial Denial Letter, #4 Exhibit C - Response Letter, #5 Exhibit D - Second Denial Letter, #6 Exhibit E - Second Response Letter, #7 Exhibit F - Initial Disclosures in Abbott Litigation, #8 Exhibit G - Decision in West Bend case) (Schurin, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Value Wholesale, Inc. v. KB Insurance Co. Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Value Wholesale, Inc.
Represented By: Richard S. Schurin
Represented By: Steven Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KB Insurance Co. Ltd d/b/a Kookmin Best Insurance Company (US Branch) f/k/a Leading Insurance Group Insurance Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KB Insurance Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?