Dapice et al v. Triple Crown Auto Sales, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marlene Schultz and Robert Dapice
Defendant: Triple Crown Auto Sales, Inc., TD Auto Finance, LLC and Best Auto Outlet Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv05902
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven M Gold
Referring Judge: Allyne R Ross
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by TD Auto Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Errata) (Kaplun, Aleksandra)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by TD Auto Finance, LLC. (Kaplun, Aleksandra)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:00 a.m. on January 23, 2019 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for plaintiffs are directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendants' counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 11/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Indivdual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. TD Auto Finance, LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 12/17/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 11/19/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia)
November 15, 2018 Filing 8 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint by TD Auto Finance, LLC. (Kaplun, Aleksandra)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Aleksandra Kaplun on behalf of TD Auto Finance, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Kaplun, Aleksandra)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Best Auto Outlet Inc., TD Auto Finance, LLC, Triple Crown Auto Sales, Inc.. (Guzzi, Roseann)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Best Auto Outlet Inc., filed by Robert Dapice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Advertisment, #2 Exhibit Ex. B RISC I, #3 Ex. C RISC II, #4 Proposed Amended Summons) (Kasell, David)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to TD Auto Finance, LLC, Triple Crown Auto Sales, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 23, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10861889 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Robert Dapice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kasell, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dapice et al v. Triple Crown Auto Sales, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple Crown Auto Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Auto Finance, LLC
Represented By: Aleksandra Kaplun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Auto Outlet Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Schultz
Represented By: David Michael Kasell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Dapice
Represented By: David Michael Kasell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?