Mioduszewski v. Polish & Slavic Federal Credit Union et al

Plaintiff: Andrzej Mioduszewski
Defendant: CEO Bogdan Chmielewski, Polish & Slavic Federal Credit Union, Director Malgorzata Czajkowska, Director Malgorzata Wadolowski, Director Elzbieta Baumgartner, Director Marzena Wierzbowska, Director Malgorzata Gradzki, National Credit Union Administration, Krzysztof Matyszczyk, Director Lech Wojtkowski, Director Bozena Krajewska-Pielarz, Director Ryszard Bak, Director Iwona Podolak and Director Edward Pierwola
Case Number: 1:2018cv06081
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: New York Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Brian M Cogan
1 Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT dated 11/8/18 that the amended complaint is dismissed; that leave to amend is denied as futile, See Cuoco v. Moritsugu, 222 F.3d 99, 112 (2d Cir. 2000); that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), any appeal would not be taken in good faith; and that in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) ( Ordered by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court on 11/8/2018 ) c/m to plaintiff w/appeals pkg. (Guzzi, Roseann)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order 7 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER dated 11/6/18 tht the amended complaint is dismissed. Leave to amend is denied as futile. See Cuoco v. Moritsugu, 222 F.3d 99, 112 (2d Cir. 2000). The Court certifies pursuant to 28:1915(a)(3) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/6/2018 ) c/m *Forwarded for jgm. (Guzzi, Roseann)
October 31, 2018 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 31, 2018 5 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-09346. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 23, 2018 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York (jwh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 23, 2018 Mailed a copy of #4 Order, to Andrzej Mioduszewski 148 Driggs Avenue APT 1R Brooklyn, NY 11222. (aea) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER: Accordingly, venue lies in the Eastern District of New York, 28 U.S.C. 1391(b)(2), and this action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York, 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff, to note service on the docket, to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York, and to close this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 44445 (1962). (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 10/23/2018) (jwh) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lech Wojtkowski. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Marzena Wierzbowska. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Malgorzata Wadolowski. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Polish & Slavic Federal Credit Union. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Iwona Podolak. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Edward Pierwola. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Credit Union Administration. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Krzysztof Matyszczyk. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bozena Krajewska-Pielarz. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Malgorzata Gradzki. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Malgorzata Czajkowska. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bogdan Chmielewski. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Elzbieta Baumgartner. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ryszard Bak. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 12, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 12, 2018 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 12, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Ryszard Bak, Elzbieta Baumgartner, Bogdan Chmielewski, Malgorzata Czajkowska, Malgorzata Gradzki, Bozena Krajewska-Pielarz, Krzysztof Matyszczyk, National Credit Union Administration, Edward Pierwola, Iwona Podolak, Polish & Slavic Federal Credit Union, Malgorzata Wadolowski, Marzena Wierzbowska, Lech Wojtkowski. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401220292)Document filed by Andrzej Mioduszewski.(pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mioduszewski v. Polish & Slavic Federal Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEO Bogdan Chmielewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polish & Slavic Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Malgorzata Czajkowska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Malgorzata Wadolowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Elzbieta Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Marzena Wierzbowska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Malgorzata Gradzki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Credit Union Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krzysztof Matyszczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Lech Wojtkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Bozena Krajewska-Pielarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Ryszard Bak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Iwona Podolak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Edward Pierwola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrzej Mioduszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?