Welenc v. Matyszczyk et al

Plaintiff: Jan Welenc
Defendant: CEO Bogdan Chmielewski, National Credit Union Administration, Iwona Podolak, Bozena Krajewska-Pielarz, Director Malgorzata Wadolowski, Malgorzata Czajkowska, Director Malgorzata Gradzki, Polish & Slavic Federal Credit Union, Krzysztof Matyszczyk, Director Lech Wojtkowski, Elzbieta Baumgartner, Marzena Wierzbowska, Director Ryszard Bak and Director Edward Pierwola
Case Number: 1:2018cv06087
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
0 Judge: Pamela K Chen
1 Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 29 Supplemental COMPLAINT / "Amended Complaint" w/request to "remove the National Credit Union Administration" from the docket sheet and [MOTION] to adjourn the initial conference scheduled for 1/11/2019, etc.; filed by pro se Jan Welenc. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Modified).
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Complaint is dismissed, without prejudice, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3). In light of Plaintiff's pro se status and in an abundance of caution, the Court grants Plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order in order to allege a basis for the Court's subject matter jurisdiction. If Plaintiff elects to file an amended complaint, it shall be captioned AMENDED COMPLAINT and bear the same docket number as this Order, 18-CV-6087 (PKC) (RLM). The amended complaint shall replace the original Complaint. All further proceedings shall be stayed for 30 days. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within the time allowed or show good cause why he cannot comply, judgment dismissing this action without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction shall be entered. Although Plaintiff has paid the filing fee to initiate this action, the Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 11/21/2018. (Cuevas Ingram, Joanna) Modified on 11/28/2018 to correct typographical error. (Abdallah, Fida)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference is set for 1/11/2019 @ 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 13C South, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York before Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED ORDER AND MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE. ****NOTE: bring the number of copies for distribution of the completed initial conference questionnaire to the conference that you will need. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 11/14/2018. (Kelson, Lise)
November 14, 2018 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Answer served on Plaintiff on 11-13-18, filed by Ryszard Bak, Elzbieta Baumgartner, Bogdan Chmielewski, Malgorzata Czajkowska, Malgorzata Gradzki, Bozena Krajewska-Pielarz, Krzysztof Matyszczyk, Edward Pierwola, Iwona Podolak, Polish & Slavic Federal Credit Union, Malgorzata Wadolowski, Marzena Wierzbowska, Lech Wojtkowski. (Saydak, Beth)
November 14, 2018 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 7.1 Statement served on Plaintiff on 11-13-18, filed by Ryszard Bak, Elzbieta Baumgartner, Bogdan Chmielewski, Malgorzata Czajkowska, Malgorzata Gradzki, Bozena Krajewska-Pielarz, Krzysztof Matyszczyk, Edward Pierwola, Iwona Podolak, Polish & Slavic Federal Credit Union, Malgorzata Wadolowski, Marzena Wierzbowska, Lech Wojtkowski. (Saydak, Beth)
November 14, 2018 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Appearance served on Plaintiff on 11-13-18, filed by Ryszard Bak, Elzbieta Baumgartner, Bogdan Chmielewski, Malgorzata Czajkowska, Malgorzata Gradzki, Bozena Krajewska-Pielarz, Krzysztof Matyszczyk, Edward Pierwola, Iwona Podolak, Polish & Slavic Federal Credit Union, Malgorzata Wadolowski, Marzena Wierzbowska, Lech Wojtkowski. (Saydak, Beth)
November 13, 2018 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ryszard Bak, Elzbieta Baumgartner, Bogdan Chmielewski, Malgorzata Czajkowska, Malgorzata Gradzki, Bozena Krajewska-Pielarz, Krzysztof Matyszczyk, Edward Pierwola, Iwona Podolak, Polish & Slavic Federal Credit Union, Malgorzata Wadolowski, Marzena Wierzbowska, Lech Wojtkowski. (Saydak, Beth)
November 13, 2018 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ryszard Bak, Elzbieta Baumgartner, Bogdan Chmielewski, Malgorzata Czajkowska, Malgorzata Gradzki, Bozena Krajewska-Pielarz, Krzysztof Matyszczyk, Edward Pierwola, Iwona Podolak, Polish & Slavic Federal Credit Union, Malgorzata Wadolowski, Marzena Wierzbowska, Lech Wojtkowski (Saydak, Beth)
November 13, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Ann Saydak on behalf of Ryszard Bak, Elzbieta Baumgartner, Bogdan Chmielewski, Malgorzata Czajkowska, Malgorzata Gradzki, Bozena Krajewska-Pielarz, Krzysztof Matyszczyk, Edward Pierwola, Iwona Podolak, Polish & Slavic Federal Credit Union, Malgorzata Wadolowski, Marzena Wierzbowska, Lech Wojtkowski (aty to be noticed) (Saydak, Beth)
October 31, 2018 Filing 20 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 31, 2018 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-09617. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 24, 2018 Mailed a copy of #18 Transfer Order E.D.N.Y. (Complaint)(case opening only), to Jan Welenc 148 Driggs Avenue Apt. 1R Brooklyn, NY 11222. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 24, 2018 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: #18 Transfer Order to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (anc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TRANSFER ORDER: Accordingly, venue lies in the Eastern District of New York, 28 U.S.C. 1391(b)(2), and this action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York, 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/24/2018) (anc) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Bogdan Chmielewski served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. Service was accepted by B. Chmielewski. Document filed by Jan Welenc. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Iwona Podolak served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. Service was accepted by Iwona Podolak. Document filed by Jan Welenc. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Edward Pierwola served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. Service was accepted by Edward Pierwola. Document filed by Jan Welenc. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Polish & Slavic Federal Credit Union served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. Service was accepted by unnamed person at (PSFCU). Document filed by Jan Welenc. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Elzbieta Baumgartner served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. Service was accepted by Elzbieta Baumgartner. Document filed by Jan Welenc. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Malgorzata Gradzki served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. Service was accepted by M. Gradzki. Document filed by Jan Welenc. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Malgorzata Czajkowska served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. Service was accepted by Malgorzata Czaykowska. Document filed by Jan Welenc. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Marzena Wierzbowska served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. Service was accepted by Marzena Wierzbowska. Document filed by Jan Welenc. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Ryszard Bak served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. Service was accepted by R. Bak. Document filed by Jan Welenc. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Lech Wojtkowski served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. Service was accepted by Lech Wojtkowski. Document filed by Jan Welenc. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Krzysztof Matyszczyk served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. Service was accepted by Krzyoztof Matyszczyk. Document filed by Jan Welenc. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Bozena Krajewska-Pielarz served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. Service was accepted by Bozena Krajewska-Ptelarz. Document filed by Jan Welenc. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Malgorzata Wadolowski served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. Service was accepted by Malgorzata Wadolowski. Document filed by Jan Welenc. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. National Credit Union Administration served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. Service was accepted by unnamed person at (PSFCU) NCUA; and served by Certified Mail to NCUA, 1775 Duke Street, Alexandria, VA 22314. Document filed by Jan Welenc. (sc) Modified on 10/23/2018 (sc). [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 19, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Polish & Slavic Federal Credit Union. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 19, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Credit Union Administration. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 19, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Edward Pierwola. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 19, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ryszard Bak. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 19, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lech Wojtkowski. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 19, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bogdan Chmielewski. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 19, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Malgorzata Wadolowski. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 19, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bozena Krajewska-Pielarz. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 19, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Malgorzata Czajkowska. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 19, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Iwona Podolak. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 19, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Marzena Wierzbowska. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 19, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Malgorzata Gradzki. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 19, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Elzbieta Baumgartner. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 19, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Krzysztof Matyszczyk. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 19, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 19, 2018 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ryszard Bak, Elzbieta Baumgartner, Bogdan Chmielewski, Malgorzata Czajkowska, Malgorzata Gradzki, Bozena Krajewska-Pielarz, Krzysztof Matyszczyk, National Credit Union Administration, Edward Pierwola, Iwona Podolak, Polish & Slavic Federal Credit Union, Malgorzata Wadolowski, Marzena Wierzbowska, Lech Wojtkowski. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401220928) Document filed by Jan Welenc. [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/31/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welenc v. Matyszczyk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEO Bogdan Chmielewski
Represented By: Beth Ann Saydak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Credit Union Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iwona Podolak
Represented By: Beth Ann Saydak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bozena Krajewska-Pielarz
Represented By: Beth Ann Saydak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Malgorzata Wadolowski
Represented By: Beth Ann Saydak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malgorzata Czajkowska
Represented By: Beth Ann Saydak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Malgorzata Gradzki
Represented By: Beth Ann Saydak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polish & Slavic Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Beth Ann Saydak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krzysztof Matyszczyk
Represented By: Beth Ann Saydak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Lech Wojtkowski
Represented By: Beth Ann Saydak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elzbieta Baumgartner
Represented By: Beth Ann Saydak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marzena Wierzbowska
Represented By: Beth Ann Saydak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Ryszard Bak
Represented By: Beth Ann Saydak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Edward Pierwola
Represented By: Beth Ann Saydak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Welenc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?