Merilon v. Trans States Airlines, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Fred Merilon
Defendant: Envoy Air, LLC, Trans States Airlines, LLC and Envoy Air, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv06289
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Pamela K Chen
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Initial Conference adjourned to 1/15/2019 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/29/2018. (Graham, Emily)
November 29, 2018 Filing 11 First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Envoy Air, Inc., Trans States Airlines, LLC. (Chan, Alice)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Trans States Airlines, LLC. (Chan, Alice)
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Envoy Air, Inc.. (Chan, Alice)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 12/6/2018 @ 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/7/2018. (Caggiano, Diana)
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Williams, Erica)
November 7, 2018 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Williams, Erica)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal With Attachments served on Julian J. Bailey - Plaintiff's Attorney on 11/6/2018, filed by Envoy Air, Inc., Trans States Airlines, LLC. (Chan, Alice)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Envoy Air, Inc. (Chan, Alice)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans States Airlines, LLC (Chan, Alice)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Envoy Air, LLC, Trans States Airlines, LLC (Chan, Alice)
November 5, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Williams, Erica)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-10908957) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Trans States Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit EXhibit B-Trans States Transmittals, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C-Envoy Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D-Envoy Transmittals, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E-American Airlines, Inc. Summons and Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F-Summary Order Remand 4/7/2017, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G-Summary Order Remand Filed 1/19/2018, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H-Demands Pursuant to 3017(c), #9 Exhibit Exhibit I-Plaintiff Response to 3017(c)) (Chan, Alice) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/6/2018) (Bowens, Priscilla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merilon v. Trans States Airlines, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Envoy Air, LLC
Represented By: Alice Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans States Airlines, LLC
Represented By: Alice Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Envoy Air, Inc.
Represented By: Alice Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Merilon
Represented By: Julian J. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?