Penafiel Reyes v. Grameen America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Emily Penafiel Reyes
Defendant: Grameen America, Inc., Johanna Avila, Priscilla Rivera and Miriam Benitez
Case Number: 1:2018cv06322
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 12 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Johanna Avila, Miriam Benitez, Grameen America, Inc., Priscilla Rivera. (Juffa, Laura)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:00 A.M. on 1/11/2019 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two day before 1/11/2019. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/4/2018. (Manson, Eddie)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion for extension of time to answer #10 is granted. The deadline for all Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is 1/7/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/4/2018. (Silberstein, Hope)
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Johanna Avila, Miriam Benitez, Grameen America, Inc., Priscilla Rivera. (Juffa, Laura)
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara for all further proceedings. Judge Brian M. Cogan no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Lee, Tiffeny)
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Johanna Avila, Miriam Benitez, Grameen America, Inc., Priscilla Rivera. (Juffa, Laura)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Baldwin Juffa on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Juffa, Laura)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith E. Williams on behalf of Emily Penafiel Reyes (aty to be noticed) (Williams, Keith)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 12/20/2018 at 5:00 PM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/8/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Johanna Avila, Miriam Benitez, Grameen America, Inc., Priscilla Rivera. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Johanna Avila, Miriam Benitez, Grameen America, Inc., Priscilla Rivera filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10914734 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Emily Penafiel Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Greenberg, Neil)
November 7, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penafiel Reyes v. Grameen America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grameen America, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Baldwin Juffa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johanna Avila
Represented By: Laura Baldwin Juffa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priscilla Rivera
Represented By: Laura Baldwin Juffa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miriam Benitez
Represented By: Laura Baldwin Juffa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Penafiel Reyes
Represented By: Neil H. Greenberg
Represented By: Keith E. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?