Hennessey v. The City of New York
Plaintiff: James Hennessey
Defendant: The City of New York
Case Number: 1:2018cv06392
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendant's counsel writes, on behalf of both parties, to request an adjournment of the January 10, 2019 initial conference. ECF No. #8 . The request is granted. The Court shall hold an initial conference on February 6, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. The parties shall exchange their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and file a 26(f) Meeting Report by January 30, 2019. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 12/19/2018. (Burks, Jory)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by The City of New York. (Zissu, Erik)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court shall hold an initial conference on January 10, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. The parties shall exchange their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and file a 26(f) Meeting Report by January 4, 2019. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 12/17/2018. (Panjini, Madhura)
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The City of New York. (Zissu, Erik)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew V. Buchsbaum on behalf of James Hennessey (aty to be noticed) (Buchsbaum, Andrew)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Hennessey. The City of New York served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint Stamped) (Friedman, Bernard)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The City of New York. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 9, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The City of New York Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by James Hennessey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Friedman, Bernard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hennessey v. The City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Represented By: Erik M. Zissu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hennessey
Represented By: Bernard D. Friedman
Represented By: Andrew V. Buchsbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?