Spatz v. Dart Industries Inc et al

Plaintiff: Amy Spatz
Defendant: Kremers-Urban Co., Mallinckrodt Inc., E.R. Squib & Sons Inc., Lannett Co., Inc, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Eli Lilly & Company, Dart Industries Inc and The Upjohn Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv06638
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: New York Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Margo K Brodie
1 Judge: Roanne L Mann
2 Judge: James Orenstein
3 Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dart Industries Inc identifying Corporate Parent Tupperware Corporation for Dart Industries Inc. (Moeller, Sheila)
January 10, 2019 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Dart Industries Inc. (Moeller, Sheila)
January 3, 2019 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheila AnnMarie Moeller on behalf of Dart Industries Inc (aty to be noticed) (Moeller, Sheila)
December 20, 2018 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #19 Motion for Discovery Schedule. The Court adopts the parties' proposed schedule in the instant action, Sullivan v. The Abbott Laboratories, 18-cv-5698, Fucaloro v. Dart Industries, 18-cv-2900 and Vicioso v. Abbott Laboratories, 18-cv-3281. A joint status report is due by February 14, 2019. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 12/20/2018. (Proujansky, Josh)
December 20, 2018 19 Letter MOTION for Discovery Schedule by Eli Lilly & Company. (Abate, Samuel)
December 20, 2018 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Upjohn Company identifying Corporate Parent Pfizer, Inc. for The Upjohn Company. (Hilgendorff, Heidi)
December 20, 2018 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Defendant Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC f/k/a the Upjohn Company by The Upjohn Company. (Hilgendorff, Heidi)
December 18, 2018 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mallinckrodt Inc. (Whitney, Daniel)
December 18, 2018 15 Mallinckrodt, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mallinckrodt Inc.. (Whitney, Daniel)
December 17, 2018 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Lannett Co., Inc. (Eliasberg, Abbie)
December 17, 2018 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lannett Co., Inc (Eliasberg, Abbie)
December 17, 2018 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly A. Connick on behalf of Lannett Co., Inc (aty to be noticed) (Connick, Kimberly)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties are directed to confer and, by December 21, 2018, to file a joint proposed discovery schedule to govern the instant case and, if reassigned to the undersigned magistrate judge, the case of Sullivan v. Abbott Labs, 18cv5698. Status Report due by 12/21/2019.Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 12/17/2018. (Kelson, Lise)
December 14, 2018 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eli Lilly & Company (Abate, Samuel)
December 14, 2018 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Eli Lilly & Company. (Abate, Samuel)
December 14, 2018 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by E.R. Squib & Sons Inc.. (Wilson, Jessica)
December 14, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Carol Wilson on behalf of E.R. Squib & Sons Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Wilson, Jessica)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann for all further proceedings. Judge Margo K. Brodie, Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 12/10/2018. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 6, 2018 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by GlaxoSmithKline LLC. (Maloney, John)
December 6, 2018 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GlaxoSmithKline LLC identifying Corporate Parent GlaxoSmithKline plc (parent) for GlaxoSmithKline LLC. (Maloney, John)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge James Orenstein recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo for all further proceedings Type of Recusal PartyOrdered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 11/26/2018. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 21, 2018 4 Notice of Related Case (Davis, Kimberly)
November 21, 2018 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 21, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Dart Industries Inc, E.R. Squib & Sons Inc., Eli Lilly & Company, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Kremers-Urban Co., Lannett Co., Inc, Mallinckrodt Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 20, 2018 FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653134476 (Davis, Kimberly)
November 20, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Dart Industries Inc, E.R. Squib & Sons Inc., Eli Lilly & Company, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Kremers-Urban Co., Lannett Co., Inc, Mallinckrodt Inc., The Upjohn Company, filed by Amy Spatz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spatz v. Dart Industries Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kremers-Urban Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Inc.
Represented By: Daniel W. Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.R. Squib & Sons Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Carol Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lannett Co., Inc
Represented By: Kimberly A. Connick
Represented By: Abbie Eliasberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Represented By: John C. Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Lilly & Company
Represented By: Samuel J. Abate, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dart Industries Inc
Represented By: Sheila AnnMarie Moeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Upjohn Company
Represented By: Heidi Elizabeth Hilgendorff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Spatz
Represented By: Michael A London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?