Cacace v. Optum, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tiziana Cacace
Defendant: Andrew Hayek, Optum, Inc., Prohealth Medical Management, LLC, Dennis Fine, UnitedHealth Group, Inc. and Corey Roberts
Case Number: 1:2018cv06856
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #19 Amended Complaint Regarding the Addition of Defendant UnitedHealth Group Incorporated by Tiziana Cacace. (Arbeit, Bryan)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court, on consent, grants the motion for an extension of time to answer. Defendant UnitedHealth Group Incorporated shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint by February 22, 2019. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 1/30/2019. (Gottlieb, Spencer)
January 29, 2019 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. (Galeano, Sonia)
January 28, 2019 Filing 20 Proposed Summons. Re #19 Amended Complaint by Tiziana Cacace (Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
January 28, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dennis Fine, Andrew Hayek, Optum, Inc., Prohealth Medical Management, LLC, Corey Roberts, UnitedHealth Group, Inc., filed by Tiziana Cacace. (Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
January 24, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to File Motion to Dismiss Count Four of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and request an adjournment of Defendants 2/4/19 deadline to respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint until a decision is made on the WITH PROPOSED DEADLINES TO AMEND AND FILE ANSWER filed by Tiziana Cacace. (Arbeit, Bryan)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER finding as moot #17 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. The Court adopts the parties' proposed schedule for amendment outlined in #18 plaintiff's letter and therefore finds the #17 request for a pre-motion conference to be moot. Plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint by 1/28/2019, and defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the second amended complaint by 2/22/2019. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 1/24/2019. (Gottlieb, Spencer)
January 17, 2019 Filing 17 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to File Motion to Dismiss Count Four of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and request an adjournment of Defendants 2/4/19 deadline to respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint until a decision is made on the Motion to Dismiss. by Dennis Fine, Andrew Hayek, Optum, Inc., Prohealth Medical Management, LLC, Corey Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-I) (Kappelman, Lynn)
December 28, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron Alexander Smith on behalf of Corey Roberts (aty to be noticed) (Smith, Cameron)
December 28, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn A. Kappelman on behalf of Corey Roberts (aty to be noticed) (Kappelman, Lynn)
December 19, 2018 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #10 Amended Complaint For Defendant Cory Roberts by Tiziana Cacace. (Arbeit, Bryan)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court grants, on consent, the parties' motion. Defendant Cory Roberts shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint by 2/4/2019. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 12/19/2018. (Gottlieb, Spencer)
December 14, 2018 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Corey Roberts c/o Optum, Inc. (Galeano, Sonia)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court, on consent, grants the parties' motion. Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint by 2/4/2019. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 12/13/2018. (Gottlieb, Spencer)
December 12, 2018 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #10 Amended Complaint by Tiziana Cacace. (Arbeit, Bryan)
December 12, 2018 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. Re #10 Amended Complaint by Tiziana Cacace (Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
December 12, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dennis Fine, Andrew Hayek, Optum, Inc., Prohealth Medical Management, LLC, Corey Roberts, filed by Tiziana Cacace. (Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prohealth Medical Management, LLC identifying Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Corporate Parent Optum, Inc., Corporate Parent Collaborative Care Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent OptumHealth Holdings, LLC for Prohealth Medical Management, LLC. (Smith, Cameron)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for Optum, Inc.. (Smith, Cameron)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn A. Kappelman on behalf of Dennis Fine, Andrew Hayek, Optum, Inc., Prohealth Medical Management, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Kappelman, Lynn)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron Alexander Smith on behalf of Dennis Fine, Andrew Hayek, Optum, Inc., Prohealth Medical Management, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Smith, Cameron)
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Dennis Fine, Andrew Hayek, Optum, Inc., Prohealth Medical Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summon, #2 Summon, #3 Summon) (Davis, Kimberly)
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 5, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan L. Arbeit on behalf of Tiziana Cacace (aty to be noticed) (Arbeit, Bryan)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dennis Fine, Andrew Hayek, Optum, Inc., Prohealth Medical Management, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10988534 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Tiziana Cacace. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons) (Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cacace v. Optum, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Hayek
Represented By: Lynn A. Kappelman
Represented By: Cameron Alexander Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Lynn A. Kappelman
Represented By: Cameron Alexander Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prohealth Medical Management, LLC
Represented By: Lynn A. Kappelman
Represented By: Cameron Alexander Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Fine
Represented By: Lynn A. Kappelman
Represented By: Cameron Alexander Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Roberts
Represented By: Lynn A. Kappelman
Represented By: Cameron Alexander Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiziana Cacace
Represented By: Bryan L. Arbeit
Represented By: Jeanne-Marie Bates Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?