KB Venture Group, LLC et al v. The City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Imran A. Jairam, KB Venture Group, LLC d/b/a Club Love and Lust and KB Venture Group, LLC
Defendant: Jason Bolgger, Umar Cheema, Thomas Redmond, Lily M Fan, William Meyer, Caitlin Manney, Vincent G. Bradley, Chad Iverson, Greeley Ford, Christopher Shea, Lorenzo Fragoso, Vitaliy Ionashko, William Hernandez, John Lattanzio, Charles A Stravalle, Roman Rashevskiy, The City of New York, Babar Ishmeet, Jose Ruiz, Peter P Ciappa, II, Alexandr Tilan, Emmanuel Gonzalez and Naomi Tatis
Case Number: 1:2018cv07003
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Carol Bagley Amon
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re #30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The application is granted as to the City of New York only. The City of New York and sua sponte, the "individual defendants" Emmanuel Gonzalez, William Meyer, Thomas Redmond, William Hernandez, Christopher Shea, Umar Cheema, Peter Ciappa, Naolmi Tatis,Chad Inverson, Jose Ruiz, John Lattanzio, Roman Rashevskiy, Lornezo Fragosos, Vitaliy Ionashko, Alexander Tilan and Babar Ishmeet must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by April 8, 2019. In light of the extensive delay occasioned by the latter ruling, I impose certain additional obligations on both parties that will avoid needlessly delaying the proceedings even further: (a) no later than February 14, 2019, the City's counsel must provide to the plaintiff for execution a release pursuant to N.Y.C.P.L. Sec. 160.50 with respect to the arrest at issue in the litigation, as well as a release authorizing the disclosure of relevant medical records if the plaintiff is seeking damages for any physical or mental injury; (b) no later than February 21, 2019, the plaintiff must execute any such release and (c) no later than April 10, 2019 the City's counsel must provide to the plaintiff the names, shield numbers, and proper service addresses of all individual officers involved in the arrest at issue in this litigation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 2/6/2019. (Vertus, Miriam)
February 6, 2019 Filing 30 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by The City of New York. (Aribakan, Suzanne)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent of the parties, the SLA Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint has been extended to March 25, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 2/5/2019. (Stern, Ethan)
February 4, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Vincent G. Bradley, Lily M Fan, Greeley Ford, Charles A Stravalle. (Siegmund, Mark)
February 4, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Siegmund on behalf of Vincent G. Bradley, Lily M Fan, Greeley Ford, Charles A Stravalle (aty to be noticed) (Siegmund, Mark)
January 17, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Imran A. Jairam, KB Venture Group, LLC. Charles A Stravalle served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Sanders, Eric)
January 17, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Imran A. Jairam, KB Venture Group, LLC. Greeley Ford served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Sanders, Eric)
January 17, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Imran A. Jairam, KB Venture Group, LLC. Lily M Fan served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Sanders, Eric)
January 17, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Imran A. Jairam, KB Venture Group, LLC. Vincent G. Bradley served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Sanders, Eric)
January 17, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Imran A. Jairam, KB Venture Group, LLC. Alexandr Tilan served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Sanders, Eric)
January 17, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Imran A. Jairam, KB Venture Group, LLC. Naomi Tatis served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Sanders, Eric)
January 17, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Imran A. Jairam, KB Venture Group, LLC. Christopher Shea served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Sanders, Eric)
January 17, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Imran A. Jairam, KB Venture Group, LLC. Jose Ruiz served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Sanders, Eric)
January 17, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Imran A. Jairam, KB Venture Group, LLC. Thomas Redmond served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Sanders, Eric)
January 17, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Imran A. Jairam, KB Venture Group, LLC. Roman Rashevskiy served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Sanders, Eric)
January 17, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Imran A. Jairam, KB Venture Group, LLC. William Meyer served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Sanders, Eric)
January 17, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Imran A. Jairam, KB Venture Group, LLC. John Lattanzio served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Sanders, Eric)
January 17, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Imran A. Jairam, KB Venture Group, LLC. Chad Iverson served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Sanders, Eric)
January 17, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Imran A. Jairam, KB Venture Group, LLC. Babar Ishmeet served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Sanders, Eric)
January 17, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Imran A. Jairam, KB Venture Group, LLC. Vitaliy Ionashko served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Sanders, Eric)
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Imran A. Jairam, KB Venture Group, LLC. William Hernandez served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Sanders, Eric)
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Imran A. Jairam, KB Venture Group, LLC. Emmanuel Gonzalez served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Sanders, Eric)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Imran A. Jairam, KB Venture Group, LLC. Lorenzo Fragoso served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Sanders, Eric)
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Imran A. Jairam, KB Venture Group, LLC. Peter P Ciappa, II served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Sanders, Eric)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Imran A. Jairam, KB Venture Group, LLC. Umar Cheema served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Sanders, Eric)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Imran A. Jairam, KB Venture Group, LLC. The City of New York served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Sanders, Eric)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 10, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by Imran A. Jairam, KB Venture Group, LLC d/b/a Club Love and Lust (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Emmanuel Gonzalez, #2 Proposed Summons William Meyer, #3 Proposed Summons Jason Bolgger, #4 Proposed Summons Thomas Redmond, #5 Proposed Summons William Hernandez, #6 Proposed Summons Christopher Shea, #7 Proposed Summons Umar Cheema, #8 Proposed Summons Peter P. Ciappa, II, #9 Proposed Summons Naomi Tatis, #10 Proposed Summons Chad Iverson, #11 Proposed Summons Jose Ruiz, #12 Proposed Summons John Lattanzio, #13 Proposed Summons Roman Rashevskiy, #14 Proposed Summons Lorenzo Fragoso, #15 Proposed Summons Vitaliy Ionashko, #16 Proposed Summons Caitlin Manney, #17 Proposed Summons Alexandr Tilan, #18 Proposed Summons Babar Ishmeet, #19 Proposed Summons Vincent G. Bradley, #20 Proposed Summons Lily M. Fan, #21 Proposed Summons Greeley Ford, #22 Proposed Summons Charles A. Stravalle) (Sanders, Eric)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint,, by Imran A. Jairam, KB Venture Group, LLC d/b/a Club Love and Lust (Sanders, Eric)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jason Bolgger, Vincent G. Bradley, Umar Cheema, Peter P Ciappa, II, Lily M Fan, Greeley Ford, Lorenzo Fragoso, Emmanuel Gonzalez, William Hernandez, Vitaliy Ionashko, Babar Ishmeet, Chad Iverson, John Lattanzio, Caitlin Manney, William Meyer, Roman Rashevskiy, Thomas Redmond, Jose Ruiz, Christopher Shea, Charles A Stravalle, Naomi Tatis, The City of New York, Alexandr Tilan filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11007077 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Imran A. Jairam, KB Venture Group, LLC d/b/a Club Love and Lust. (Sanders, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KB Venture Group, LLC et al v. The City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Bolgger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Umar Cheema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lily M Fan
Represented By: Mark Siegmund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caitlin Manney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent G. Bradley
Represented By: Mark Siegmund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Iverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greeley Ford
Represented By: Mark Siegmund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorenzo Fragoso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vitaliy Ionashko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lattanzio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles A Stravalle
Represented By: Mark Siegmund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Rashevskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Represented By: Suzanne Emily Aribakan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Babar Ishmeet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter P Ciappa, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandr Tilan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmanuel Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naomi Tatis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imran A. Jairam
Represented By: Eric Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KB Venture Group, LLC d/b/a Club Love and Lust
Represented By: Eric Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KB Venture Group, LLC
Represented By: Eric Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?