Vosfieva et al v. JetBlue Airways Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Aleksandr Pigulevskiy and Lola Vosfieva
Defendant: Jane Doe, John Doe and JetBlue Airways Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv07393
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven M Gold
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #12 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The initial conference previously scheduled for February 27, 2019 is adjourned to March 6, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 2/21/2019. (Gillespie, Saudia)
February 20, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Lola Vosfieva. (Boudakova, Anna)
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Gogal Passeri on behalf of JetBlue Airways Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Gogal Passeri, Sarah)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Raffaele, Steven)
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lola Vosfieva. (Boudakova, Anna)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Anna V. Boudakova shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150.00 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 1/24/2019. (Gillespie, Saudia)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anna V. Boudakova, Esq. Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11133923. by Lola Vosfieva. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing NYS) (Boudakova, Anna)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:00 a.m. on February 27, 2019 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for defendant is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with plaintiff's counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 1/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Indivdual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. JetBlue Airways Corporation shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by 2/14/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 1/2/2019. (Gillespie, Saudia)
December 31, 2018 Filing 6 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, /Complaint by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Raffaele, Steven)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 27, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Michael Raffaele on behalf of JetBlue Airways Corporation (notification declined or already on case) (Raffaele, Steven)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JetBlue Airways Corporation (Raffaele, Steven)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JetBlue Airways Corporation from Supreme Court, Richmond County, case number 153049/2018. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11058103) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Verified Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Raffaele, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vosfieva et al v. JetBlue Airways Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Represented By: Steven Michael Raffaele
Represented By: Sarah Gogal Passeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleksandr Pigulevskiy
Represented By: Anna V. Boudakova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lola Vosfieva
Represented By: Anna V. Boudakova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?