N.A.R. v. The City of New York et al
Plaintiff: N.A.R.
Defendant: The City of New York and New York City Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2019cv00078
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 12:00 PM on 3/08/2019 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 3/08/2019. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 1/24/2019. (Manson, Eddie)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion for extension of time to answer #6 is granted. Defendants must respond to the Complaint on or before 3/8/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 1/24/2019. (Silberstein, Hope)
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint by New York City Department of Education, The City of New York. (Ridgeway, Thais)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thais R. Ridgeway on behalf of New York City Department of Education, The City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Ridgeway, Thais)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by N.A.R.. New York City Department of Education served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019; The City of New York served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Hartley, Erika)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to New York City Department of Education, The City of New York. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York City Department of Education, The City of New York, filed by N.A.R.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly)
January 4, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653135756 (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N.A.R. v. The City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.A.R.
Represented By: Erika Louise Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Represented By: Thais R. Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Thais R. Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?