Bank of America, N.A. v. Dexter Sales, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A Bank Of America, N.A. and Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Alan M. Samdperil, Beth Garbow, and Dexter Sales, Inc.,
Case Number: 1:2019cv00110
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James Orenstein
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to appear for an initial discovery planning conference on, April 3, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11D South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. No later than April 1, 2019, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. Each party's counsel must be personally prepared to discuss all factual and legal issues in the case, including the possibility of settlement; otherwise, the client must attend in person as well. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 2/28/2019. (Guy, Alicia)
February 22, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Alan M. Samdperil, Beth Garbow,, Dexter Sales, Inc.,. (Hellman, Jay)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer -- The motion is granted on consent and the stipulation is so ordered; the defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by February 22, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 1/29/2019. (Roantree, Bronwyn)
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Request to so-order stipulation extending the time for defendants to respond to the complaint by Alan M. Samdperil, Beth Garbow,, Dexter Sales, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation to be so-ordered) (Ciaffa, Michael)
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bank Of America, N.A.. Alan M. Samdperil served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (Samuels, Michael)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bank Of America, N.A.. Beth Garbow, served on 1/11/2019, answer due 2/1/2019. (Samuels, Michael)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bank Of America, N.A.. Dexter Sales, Inc., served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (Samuels, Michael)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Ciaffa on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Ciaffa, Michael)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay S. Hellman on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Hellman, Jay)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 7, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank Of America, N.A. (Samuels, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11080121 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Bank Of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Summons to Dexter Sales, Inc., #2 Proposed Summons Summons to Beth Garbow, #3 Proposed Summons Summons to Alan M. Samdperil, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1- LOC Loan Agreement, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Security Agreement, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Guaranties, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Amendment No. 1 o Loan Agreement, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Loan Modification, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Reminder Notice, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - First Default Notice, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Second Default Notice, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Third Default Notice, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - UCC-1 summary report, #14 Civil Cover Sheet) (Samuels, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Dexter Sales, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan M. Samdperil
Represented By: Jay S. Hellman
Represented By: Michael A. Ciaffa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Garbow,
Represented By: Jay S. Hellman
Represented By: Michael A. Ciaffa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Sales, Inc.,
Represented By: Jay S. Hellman
Represented By: Michael A. Ciaffa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A Bank Of America, N.A.
Represented By: Michael Adam Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Michael Adam Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?