Kellner et al v. Amazon

Plaintiff: Jacob Kellner and I & L Distributing Inc.
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon
Case Number: 1:2019cv00131
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER Civil Case Terminated as per plaintiff's Rule 41 notice. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/24/2019. (Cogan, Brian)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by I & L Distributing Inc., Jacob Kellner (Spata, Vincent)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #6 Letter. This letter should have been designated as a Letter "motion" since it seeks relief from the Court. Do not refile the letter. Plaintiff's request is granted; his response to the Order to Show Cause is due 1/29/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/11/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 Letter requesting an extention by I & L Distributing Inc., Jacob Kellner (Spata, Vincent)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #1 . The complaint does not properly allege subject matter jurisdiction. The only basis for subject matter jurisdiction alleged is diversity of citizenship, but describing defendant as a "Worldwide Commercial enterprise," whatever that means, is insufficient to establish its citizenship. In addition, the only basis for venue alleged is plaintiff's "principle office of Business [sic]," but the Judicial Code does not authorize venue based on plaintiff's principle office of business or state of incorporation in diversity cases. Plaintiff shall therefore show cause by 1/18/2019 why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction or transferred to the appropriate federal district. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/11/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Amazon. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 11, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by I & L Distributing Inc., Jacob Kellner (Spata, Vincent) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/11/2019) (Bowens, Priscilla).
January 10, 2019 NOTICE - The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon.com, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11084351 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Jacob Kellner, I & L Distributing Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Spata, Vincent) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/10/2019) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/10/2019) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/10/2019) (Bowens, Priscilla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kellner et al v. Amazon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Kellner
Represented By: Vincent F. Spata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I & L Distributing Inc.
Represented By: Vincent F. Spata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?