Finkel v. McGlynn Hays & Co., Inc.

Petitioner: Dr. Gerald R. Finkel
Respondent: McGlynn Hays & Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00215
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Raymond J Dearie
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Petitioner's Notice of Dismissal Pursuant to Fed.R. Civ. P. 41(a))(1)(A)(i), without prejudice and without costs in favor of any party against another. So Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 3/11/2019. (Lee, Tiffeny)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gerald R. Finkel (Marimon, Nicole)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 Letter Requesting that the Court deem the Petition as an unopposed motion for summary judgment. by Gerald R. Finkel (Marimon, Nicole)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gerald R. Finkel. McGlynn Hays & Co., Inc. served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/13/2019. (Marimon, Nicole)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to McGlynn Hays & Co., Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 11, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Raymond J. Dearie and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 Petition re: Arbitration Award, filed by Dr. Gerald R. Finkel, as Chairman of the Joint Industry Board of the Electrical Industry. (Marimon, Nicole)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Petition re: Arbitration Award, by Dr. Gerald R. Finkel, as Chairman of the Joint Industry Board of the Electrical Industry (Marimon, Nicole)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Petition re: Arbitration Award, by Dr. Gerald R. Finkel, as Chairman of the Joint Industry Board of the Electrical Industry (Marimon, Nicole)
January 11, 2019 CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11094786 (Marimon, Nicole)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION re: Arbitration Award , filed by Dr. Gerald R. Finkel, as Chairman of the Joint Industry Board of the Electrical Industry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Marimon, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finkel v. McGlynn Hays & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: McGlynn Hays & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dr. Gerald R. Finkel
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?