Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Travelers Commercial Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Travelers Commercial Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00220
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Roanne L Mann
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The proposed briefing schedule at #8 is so-ordered, subject to the Bundling Rule. The fully-briefed motion must be filed on ECF by May 9, 2019. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 2/12/2019. (Syed, Sofie)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 Letter regarding Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule with request to So Order by Travelers Commercial Insurance Company (Kokalas, Marci)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Plaintiff has failed to respond to the pre-motion conference request #6 as directed by the Court on February 3, 2019. Regardless, upon review of defendant's papers, a pre-motion conference is not required. The parties are directed to file a joint proposed briefing schedule. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 2/11/2019. (Syed, Sofie)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address (Kokalas, Marci)
February 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to respond to the pre-motion conference request #6 by February 8, 2019. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 2/3/2019. (Syed, Sofie)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Travelers Commercial Insurance Company. (Kokalas, Marci)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Related Case (Davis, Kimberly)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Commercial Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for Travelers Commercial Insurance Company. (Kokalas, Marci)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Travelers Commercial Insurance Company from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Queens, case number 713354/2018. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11095961) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Kokalas, Marci)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Travelers Commercial Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Maxwell Rubinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Commercial Insurance Company
Represented By: Marci Goldstein Kokalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?