Madar v. Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Itschak Madar
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC, Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC and Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00231
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Raymond J Dearie
Referring Judge: Steven M Gold
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by March 26, 2019. The initial conference previously scheduled for March 15, 2019 is adjourned to April 9, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 2/22/2019. (Gillespie, Saudia)
February 21, 2019 Filing 16 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for all defendants with consent by Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC. (Quinn, Lori)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants LVNV Funding, LLC and Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by February 26, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 2/12/2019. (Gillespie, Saudia)
February 4, 2019 Filing 15 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint, with consent by LVNV Funding, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.. (Sanders, Arthur)
February 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur Sanders on behalf of LVNV Funding, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Sanders, Arthur)
February 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur Sanders on behalf of Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. (aty to be noticed) (Sanders, Arthur)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:00 a.m. on March 15, 2019 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendants' counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 2/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Indivdual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by February 26, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 2/1/2019. (Gillespie, Saudia)
February 1, 2019 Filing 11 Letter Motion requesting extension of time to answer complaint on consent by Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC (Quinn, Lori) Modified to add motion on 2/1/2019 (Gillespie, Saudia).
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori Jean Quinn on behalf of Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Quinn, Lori)
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Itschak Madar. LVNV Funding, LLC served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Hardy, Tiffany)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Itschak Madar. Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Hardy, Tiffany)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Itschak Madar. Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (Hardy, Tiffany)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C Cohen on behalf of Itschak Madar (aty to be noticed) (Cohen, Daniel)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 11, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Raymond J. Dearie and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany N. Hardy on behalf of Itschak Madar (notification declined or already on case) (Hardy, Tiffany)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LVNV Funding, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services, L.P., Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11097894 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Itschak Madar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Sequium Summons, #3 Proposed Summons Resurgent Summons, #4 Proposed Summons LVNV Summons) (Hardy, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madar v. Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC
Represented By: Arthur Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Lori Jean Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.
Represented By: Arthur Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Itschak Madar
Represented By: Tiffany N. Hardy
Represented By: Daniel C Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?