Byrd v. Long Island Rail Road Company

Plaintiff: Delroy Byrd
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00257
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
0 Judge: Margo K Brodie
1 Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall submit a joint certification that discovery has been completed by 11/08/2019. Other deadlines set based on parties' submitted joint discovery worksheet and are reflected in the attached order. An in-person settlement conference will be held on 8/27/2019 at 2:00 P.M. before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. All parties must be present. Parties are to submit their respective ex parte settlement positions via Chambers email no later than three days before 8/27/2019. Counsel are to refer to the Settlement Section of this Court's Individual Rules in preparation for the conference, which is available on the Courts website. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 3/14/2019. (Manson, Eddie)
March 14, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara: An in person initial conference was held on 3/14/2019. Counsel for both parties were present. (See separate docket entry for orders issuing from this proceeding.) (FTR Log #2:25-2:49.) (Manson, Eddie)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Scheduling Order of the Parties by Delroy Byrd (Lauriello, Valerie)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 2:00 P.M. on 3/14/2019 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 3/14/2019. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 2/28/2019. (Manson, Eddie)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Long Island Rail Road Company. (Yodice, Christopher)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Long Island Rail Road Company identifying Corporate Parent MTA, Other Affiliate MTA Bridges and Tunnels, Other Affiliate MTA Metro-North Commuter Railroad, Other Affiliate MTA Capital Construction, Other Affiliate MTA New York City Transit, Other Affiliate MTA Bus Company and MTA Staten Island Railway for Long Island Rail Road Company. (Yodice, Christopher)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Delroy Byrd. Long Island Rail Road Company served on 2/5/2019, answer due 2/26/2019. (Lauriello, Valerie)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Long Island Rail Road Company. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 14, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Long Island Rail Road Company filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11101571 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Delroy Byrd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Lauriello, Valerie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrd v. Long Island Rail Road Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delroy Byrd
Represented By: Valerie J. Lauriello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Represented By: Christopher P. Yodice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?