Tang v. Visnauskas et al
Plaintiff: Hong Tang
Defendant: RuthAnne Visnauskas and Woody Pascal
Case Number: 1:2019cv00508
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Pamela K Chen
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: See annexed Order. Plaintiff is directed to serve the Summons and Complaint on all defendants as soon as possible and promptly advise the Court once defendants have been served. If service is not made upon defendants by April 25, 2019, or plaintiff fails to show good cause why such service has not been effected, in accordance with FRCP 4(m), it will be recommended that the Court dismiss this action without prejudice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 2/1/2019. (Copy of Order and Judge Kuo's Individual Practice Rules are mailed to pro se plaintiff.) (Riquelme, Claudia)
January 31, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Woody Pascal, RuthAnne Visnauskas. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 25, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653136506 (Davis, Kimberly)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Woody Pascal, RuthAnne Visnauskas, filed by Hong Tang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tang v. Visnauskas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RuthAnne Visnauskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woody Pascal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hong Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?