United States of America v. $133,305.00
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $133,305.00
Case Number: 1:2019cv00543
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Raymond J Dearie
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America Affidavit of publication, legal notice was published on the official government website www.forfeiture.gov, beginning on February 2, 2019 and ending on March 3, 2019. (Payne, Tanisha)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property. WHEREAS, the Court being satisfied that, based on the Verified Complaint, there is probable cause to believe that the Defendant Funds are subject to seizure and forfeiture pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 98l(a)(l)(A) and 21 U.S.C. 88l(a)(6), and that grounds for issuance of a Summons and Warrant of Arrest for Articles in rem exist pursuant to Supplemental Rule G(3) of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions. So Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 1/31/2019. (Almonte, Giselle)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $133,305.00 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons and Warrant of Arrest) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $133,305.00
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $133,305.00
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Tanisha R. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?