Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Marina Galea, M.D. et al
Plaintiff: VALERY KOTLYAR a/k/a VALERIY KOTLYAR, GALMAR DIAGNOSTIC MEDICAL, P.C., Geico Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, RAP SERVICES, INC., Government Employees Insurance Company and MGAL MEDICAL SERVICES, P.C.
Defendant: John Does 1 through 20, MARINA GALEA, M.D., ABC Corporations 1 through 20, MG Medical Care, P.C., MAG MEDICAL DIAGNOSTIC, P.C., Valery Kotlyar and Valeriy Kotlyar
Case Number: 1:2019cv00663
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Robert M Levy
Referring Judge: Allyne R Ross
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 5/23/2019 12:30 PM in Courtroom 11B South before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 3/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 ICQuestionnaire/Individual Rules) (Marino, Janine)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Valery Kotlyar answer due 4/25/2019; RAP Services, Inc. answer due 4/25/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 3/28/2019. (Marino, Janine)
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, with request to be "So Ordered" by Valery Kotlyar, RAP Services, Inc.. (Villanti, Christopher)
March 19, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Marina Galea, MD served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Hlinka, Vanessa)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Valery Kotlyar served on 2/27/2019, answer due 3/20/2019. (Gerbino, Vincent)
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. RAP Services, Inc. served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Gerbino, Vincent)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. MGAL Medical Services, P.C. served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Gerbino, Vincent)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company. MG Medical Care, P.C. served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Gerbino, Vincent)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company. MAG Medical Diagnostic, P.C. served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Gerbino, Vincent)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company. Galmar Diagnostic Medical, P.C. served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Gerbino, Vincent)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 4, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABC Corporations 1 through 20, John Does 1 through 20, GALMAR DIAGNOSTIC MEDICAL, P.C., MAG MEDICAL DIAGNOSTIC, P.C., MARINA GALEA, M.D., MG Medical Care, P.C., MGAL MEDICAL SERVICES, P.C., RAP SERVICES, INC., VALERY KOTLYAR a/k/a VALERIY KOTLYAR filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11164555 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit Fraudulent Billing Chart, #4 Exhibit Fraudulent Billing Chart, #5 Exhibit Fraudulent Billing Chart, #6 Exhibit Fraudulent Billing Chart) (Hlinka, Vanessa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2019: #7 Proposed Summons) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/5/2019) (Bowens, Priscilla). Modified on 2/5/2019 (Bowens, Priscilla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Marina Galea, M.D. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARINA GALEA, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MG Medical Care, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAG MEDICAL DIAGNOSTIC, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valery Kotlyar
Represented By: Christopher Anthony Villanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valeriy Kotlyar
Represented By: Christopher Anthony Villanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALERY KOTLYAR a/k/a VALERIY KOTLYAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GALMAR DIAGNOSTIC MEDICAL, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Vanessa H. Hlinka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico Casualty Company
Represented By: Vanessa H. Hlinka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Vanessa H. Hlinka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAP SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Vanessa H. Hlinka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MGAL MEDICAL SERVICES, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?