Fleming v. Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tessa Fleming and Brian Mazzola
Defendant: Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00775
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Allyne R Ross
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Marine Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B. Ronemus on behalf of All Plaintiffs (notification declined or already on case) (Ronemus, Michael)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Having reviewed the Pro Hac Vice application #8 submitted by Brian N. Mazzola for Plaintiff and found it to be in compliance with the local rules concerning attorney admissions, the application is approved. If not already done, the attorney shall register for ECF which is available online at the NYED's homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notifications of activity in this case. The attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee is submitted to the Clerk's Office. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 3/8/2019. (Vasquez, Lea)
March 8, 2019 Motions terminated, docketed incorrectly: #9 Eighth MOTION for Leave to File Document Certificate of Good Standing filed by Tessa Fleming. This filing was not a motion but an attachment to docket entry #8 . (Vasquez, Lea)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 Eighth MOTION for Leave to File Document Certificate of Good Standing by Tessa Fleming. (Ronemus, Michael)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER temporarily denying #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice docket entry number #8 is temporarily denied because the Certificate of Good Standing attached is expired. Counsel shall supplement the application with current a Certificate of Good Standing no later than March 8th or the Motion will be fully denied. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 2/28/2019. (Vasquez, Lea)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11240035. by Tessa Fleming. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Administrative Record Certificate of Good Standing) (Ronemus, Michael)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc. (Fennell, Ryan)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , Respectfully submitted by Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.. (Fennell, Ryan)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Tessa Fleming (Ronemus, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 7, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan E. Fennell on behalf of Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Fennell, Ryan)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County Queens, case number 700437/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11178683) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit Amended Summons & Amended Verified Complaint, #3 Declaration, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fennell, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleming v. Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan E. Fennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tessa Fleming
Represented By: Michael B. Ronemus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Mazzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?