Parraga v. The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey et al
Plaintiff: Rita Parraga
Defendant: LATAM Airlines Group, S.A. and The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey
Case Number: 1:2019cv00787
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 MINUTE ENTRY for Initial Conference proceeding held before MJ Pollak on 3/22/2019. Appearance for Plaintiff: Michelle Jean-Jacques. Appearance for Defendant: Robert Michael Iodice \ David Scott Rutherford. Parties to determine whether: (1) to dismiss Port Authority; (2) bring a third party action against Eulen; and\or (3) amend the complaint. Plaintiff and LATAM to exchange initial disclosures. Status Conference set for 6/17/2019 @ 10:30 AM. (Caggiano, Diana)
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey re #8 Notice of Appearance (Rutherford, David)
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David Scott Rutherford on behalf of The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey (aty to be noticed) (Rutherford, David)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Michael Iodice on behalf of LATAM Airlines Group, S.A. (aty to be noticed) (Iodice, Robert)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Verified) by LATAM Airlines Group, S.A.. (Battista, Anthony)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Jean-Jacques on behalf of Rita Parraga (aty to be noticed) (Jean-Jacques, Michelle)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 3/22/2019 @ 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 2/13/2019. (Caggiano, Diana)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 8, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LATAM Airlines Group, S.A. from Supreme County, Queens County, case number 700540/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11181747) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit Consent to Removal) (Battista, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parraga v. The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LATAM Airlines Group, S.A.
Represented By: Anthony U. Battista
Represented By: Robert Michael Iodice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey
Represented By: David Scott Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Parraga
Represented By: Mark J. Linder
Represented By: Michelle Jean-Jacques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?