McMullen v. Hamilton et al

Plaintiff: Gary McMullen
Defendant: Gary G. Gemignani, Troy Hamilton and Gary S. Jacob
Petitioner: Michael Margulis, Joseph Badolato, Robert Tilton, Joseph Buck and Cross Country Media and Sourcing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00825
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 Letter MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Gary McMullen. (Guiney, Matthew)
March 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Donovan on behalf of Gary McMullen (aty to be noticed) (Donovan, Patrick)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 5/16/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 13A South. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with Defendants' counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 5/9/2019. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference unless in an emergency. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 3/13/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 Letter MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Robert Tilton, Cross Country Media and Sourcing, Inc., Joseph Badolato, Michael Margulis, Joseph Buck. (Gonnello, Richard)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Gary G. Gemignani answer due 5/10/2019; Troy Hamilton answer due 5/10/2019; Gary S. Jacob answer due 5/10/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 3/11/2019. (McCuiston, Hannah)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 Letter in response to Defendants' March 4, 2019 letter seeking consolidation by Gary McMullen (Guiney, Matthew)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon for all further proceedings. Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto, Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 3/4/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 Letter in reply to Plaintiff's February 27, 2019 letter opposing consolidation by Gary G. Gemignani, Troy Hamilton, Gary S. Jacob (Polubinski, Edmund)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Gary G. Gemignani, Troy Hamilton, Gary S. Jacob. (Polubinski, Edmund)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund Polubinski, III on behalf of Gary G. Gemignani, Troy Hamilton, Gary S. Jacob (aty to be noticed) (Polubinski, Edmund)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 Letter in response to Defendants' February 21, 2019 letter seeking consolidation by Gary McMullen (Guiney, Matthew)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 Letter to Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court, requesting a judicial determination that the referenced action is related to an earlier-filed action and requesting that the referenced action be consolidated with the earlier-filed action by Gary G. Gemignani, Troy Hamilton, Gary S. Jacob (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Polubinski, Edmund)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Related Case (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 11, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gary G. Gemignani, Troy Hamilton, Gary S. Jacob filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11188725 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Gary McMullen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Plaintiff's Certification) (Guiney, Matthew) Modified. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMullen v. Hamilton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary McMullen
Represented By: Matthew M Guiney
Represented By: Patrick Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary G. Gemignani
Represented By: Edmund Polubinski, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Hamilton
Represented By: Edmund Polubinski, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary S. Jacob
Represented By: Edmund Polubinski, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Margulis
Represented By: Richard W. Gonnello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Badolato
Represented By: Richard W. Gonnello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Tilton
Represented By: Richard W. Gonnello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Buck
Represented By: Richard W. Gonnello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cross Country Media and Sourcing, Inc.
Represented By: Richard W. Gonnello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?