Santarella v. Schiller

Plaintiff: SUSAN SANTARELLA
Defendant: Jeffrey Schiller and Jeffrey Schiller, M.D.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00826
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #13 . The parties will file a motion to approve the settlement by 4/29/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/11/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
April 11, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Settlement Agreement by Susan Santarella. (Coren, Steven)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 . Initial Status Conference previously scheduled for 3/27/2019 is adjourned sine die. The parties will file a motion to approve the settlement by 4/15/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/25/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
March 22, 2019 Filing 12 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Request for Extension of Time to Submit the Settlement by Jeffrey Schiller, MD. (Klein, Douglas)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Godfre Orion Blackman, I on behalf of Jeffrey Schiller, MD (aty to be noticed) (Blackman, Godfre)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #9 Letter Requesting an Extension of Time. In the future, letters requesting relief from the Court must be designated as letter "Motion" on ECF. The request is granted. Defendant's time to answer is extended to 3/26/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/6/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Santarella. Jeffrey Schiller, MD served on 2/19/2019, answer due 3/12/2019. (Coren, Steven)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 Letter Requesting an Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint by Jeffrey Schiller, MD (Klein, Douglas)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas J. Klein on behalf of Jeffrey Schiller, MD (aty to be noticed) (Klein, Douglas)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 3/27/2019 at 5:00 PM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/12/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Schiller, MD. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 11, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by SUSAN SANTARELLA (Coren, Steven)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. by SUSAN SANTARELLA (Coren, Steven)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11188818 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by SUSAN SANTARELLA. (Coren, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santarella v. Schiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Schiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Schiller, M.D.
Represented By: Godfre Orion Blackman, I
Represented By: Douglas J. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN SANTARELLA
Represented By: Steven Mitchell Coren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?