Almerdaei et al v. Trump et al

Plaintiff: Mar Abdo Kaid, Saman Al-Gaad, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Saeed Sharif, Emtethal Al-Nomair, Faisal Algudari, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, H.W.M.Q. (2), G.H.A., Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Jamilah Ali, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Majdy Alharbi, Siham Rajeh, Saqr Al-Nomair, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Hilal Al-Nomair, Amal Almansouri, Abdelbaset Ali, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Amr Aldaylam, Yaha Amer Alhagag, The Estate of Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, S.H.A., Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Mutei Al Ghazali, Arwa Saleh, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Esmayl Algazali, M.A., Nabila Alhanash, Latifiya Algazali, Nada Alghaithy, Abdulrakib Abashaar, Kubla Moshin, Fayzah Abdullah, Geab Saeed, Abdurahman Al Malki, Mokhtar Nasser, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Suood Almerdaei, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Ghaithah Sharoh, Somayah Al Najar, Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Saba Al Harmi, Ahlam Hauter, M.M.N.A., H.W.M.Q., Mohamed Qasem, Naif Al Najar, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, S.A., Faiz Ali Al-Nomair, Norh A. Ahmed, Atef Rajeh, Ghamdam Nasser, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Mansour Mohamed, F.S., Tawfik Rajeh, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, A.R., Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Kawkab Al Malki, Hussein Ali Yafai, Suriah Mohamed Muthana, Ali Abdo Saleh, B.H.A., Abdasalam Saeed, A.A., Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Mona Abass Zabara, Amal Al-Okam, Amin El Burati, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Diana Arevalo, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Abdo Ali Saleh, Anhar Abdullah Taher and Etidal Alkuaif
Defendant: Devin Kennington, U.S. Department of State, Ryan Nolan, Trump J. Donald, U.S. Embassy in Djibouti, Michael Pompeo, Daniel Coats, Kirstjen Nielsen, Chapman Godbey, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of Homeland Security ("DHS") and Matthew Whitaker
Case Number: 1:2019cv00830
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 62 Letter Regarding Service of Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to the Government's Motion to Dismiss by A.A., A.R., Abdulrakib Abashaar, Fayzah Abdullah, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Norh A. Ahmed, Mutei Al Ghazali, Saba Al Harmi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Kawkab Al Malki, Somayah Al Najar, Naif Al Najar, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Saman Al-Gaad, Emtethal Al-Nomair, Hilal Al-Nomair, Saqr Al-Nomair, Amal Al-Okam, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Amr Aldaylam, Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Esmayl Algazali, Latifiya Algazali, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Nada Alghaithy, Faisal Algudari, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Nabila Alhanash, Majdy Alharbi, Abdelbaset Ali, Jamilah Ali, Etidal Alkuaif, Amal Almansouri, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Diana Arevalo, B.H.A., Amin El Burati, F.S., G.H.A., H.W.M.Q., H.W.M.Q. (2), Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Ahlam Hauter, Mar Abdo Kaid, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, M.A., M.M.N.A., Mansour Mohamed, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Kubla Moshin, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Suriah Mohamed Muthana, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Ghamdam Nasser, Mokhtar Nasser, Mohamed Qasem, Siham Rajeh, Tawfik Rajeh, Atef Rajeh, S.A., S.H.A., Abdasalam Saeed, Geab Saeed, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Abdo Ali Saleh, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Ali Abdo Saleh, Arwa Saleh, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Saeed Sharif, Ghaithah Sharoh, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Anhar Abdullah Taher, Hussein Ali Yafai, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Mona Abass Zabara (Goldberg, Julie)
April 1, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE by A.A., A.R., Abdulrakib Abashaar, Fayzah Abdullah, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Norh A. Ahmed, Mutei Al Ghazali, Saba Al Harmi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Kawkab Al Malki, Somayah Al Najar, Naif Al Najar, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Saman Al-Gaad, Emtethal Al-Nomair, Hilal Al-Nomair, Saqr Al-Nomair, Amal Al-Okam, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Amr Aldaylam, Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Esmayl Algazali, Latifiya Algazali, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Nada Alghaithy, Faisal Algudari, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Nabila Alhanash, Majdy Alharbi, Abdelbaset Ali, Jamilah Ali, Etidal Alkuaif, Amal Almansouri, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Diana Arevalo, B.H.A., Amin El Burati, F.S., G.H.A., H.W.M.Q., H.W.M.Q. (2), Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Ahlam Hauter, Mar Abdo Kaid, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, M.A., M.M.N.A., Mansour Mohamed, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Kubla Moshin, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Suriah Mohamed Muthana, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Ghamdam Nasser, Mokhtar Nasser, Mohamed Qasem, Siham Rajeh, Tawfik Rajeh, Atef Rajeh, S.A., S.H.A., Abdasalam Saeed, Geab Saeed, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Abdo Ali Saleh, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Ali Abdo Saleh, Arwa Saleh, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Saeed Sharif, Ghaithah Sharoh, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Anhar Abdullah Taher, Hussein Ali Yafai, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Mona Abass Zabara Notice of Unavailability of Counsel for Plaintiffs (Goldberg, Julie)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #60 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 3/28/2019. (Kuntz, William)
March 28, 2019 Filing 60 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Government's Motion to Dismiss by A.A., A.R., Abdulrakib Abashaar, Fayzah Abdullah, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Norh A. Ahmed, Mutei Al Ghazali, Saba Al Harmi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Kawkab Al Malki, Somayah Al Najar, Naif Al Najar, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Saman Al-Gaad, Emtethal Al-Nomair, Hilal Al-Nomair, Saqr Al-Nomair, Amal Al-Okam, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Amr Aldaylam, Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Esmayl Algazali, Latifiya Algazali, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Nada Alghaithy, Faisal Algudari, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Nabila Alhanash, Majdy Alharbi, Abdelbaset Ali, Jamilah Ali, Etidal Alkuaif, Amal Almansouri, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Diana Arevalo, B.H.A., Amin El Burati, F.S., G.H.A., H.W.M.Q., H.W.M.Q. (2), Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Ahlam Hauter, Mar Abdo Kaid, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, M.A., M.M.N.A., Mansour Mohamed, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Kubla Moshin, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Suriah Mohamed Muthana, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Ghamdam Nasser, Mokhtar Nasser, Mohamed Qasem, Siham Rajeh, Tawfik Rajeh, Atef Rajeh, S.A., S.H.A., Abdasalam Saeed, Geab Saeed, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Abdo Ali Saleh, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Ali Abdo Saleh, Arwa Saleh, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Saeed Sharif, Ghaithah Sharoh, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Anhar Abdullah Taher, Hussein Ali Yafai, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Mona Abass Zabara. (Goldberg, Julie)
March 22, 2019 Filing 59 Letter regarding service of the Government's motion to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by Daniel Coats, Trump J. Donald, Chapman Godbey, Devin Kennington, Kirstjen Nielsen, Ryan Nolan, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Michael Pompeo, U.S. Department of Homeland Security ("DHS"), U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Embassy in Djibouti, Matthew Whitaker (Ramkumar, Archith)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Defendants must file their motion to dismiss on or before Friday, March 22, 2019 at 5:00 P.M. on ECF; Plaintiffs must file their response to Defendants' motion on or before Friday, March 29, 2019 at 5:00 P.M. on ECF; and Defendants must file a reply, if any, by Friday, April 12, 2019 at 5:00 P.M. on ECF. This Court further ORDERS a complete stay of discovery in this action until the motion to dismiss is decided. (See Order for instructions)SO Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 2/19/2019. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
February 19, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William F. Kuntz, II: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 2/19/2019. Appearances: Julie Goldberg, Esq., Mehgan Gallagher, Esq., and Suryia Rahman, Esq., appeared on behalf of the Plaintiffs. Gisela Westwater, Esq., Archith Ramkumar, Esq., and Farzin Amanat, Esq., appeared on behalf of the Defendants.. The Court granted Defendants' application to make a Motion to Dismiss. The Court ordered the following briefing schedule: 1) Defendants shall serve the motion to dismiss on or before Friday, March 22, 2019; 2) Plaintiffs shall serve the memorandum in opposition on or before Friday, March 29, 2019; and 3) Defendants shall serve the reply memorandum on or before Friday, April 12, 2019. As a courtesy to the Court, the Court requests that the parties refrain from filing motion papers until the motion has been fully briefed. If the parties elect to file their motion only once it is fully briefed, the notice of motion and all supporting papers are to be served on the other parties along with a cover letter setting forth whom the movant represents and the papers being served. Only a copy of the cover letter shall be electronically filed in advance of the fully briefed motion, and it must be filed as a letter, not as a motion. On the day the motion is fully briefed, April 12, 2019, the parties shall electronically file their individual papers by 5:00 p.m. Defense counsel shall mail a complete set of courtesy copies of all motion papers, via overnight mail, to the United States District Courthouse, attention of Mr. Andrew Jackson. Discovery is stayed until the motion to dismiss is decided. (Court Reporter Denise Parisi.) (Jackson, Andrew)
February 19, 2019 Filing 57 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ahlam Hauter, Abdulrakib Abashaar, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Amin El Burati, Amal Al-Okam, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Hilal Al-Nomair, H.W.M.Q., Naif Al Najar, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Fayzah Abdullah, F.S., Suriah Mohamed Muthana, M.A., Emtethal Al-Nomair, Etidal Alkuaif, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Arwa Saleh, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Faisal Algudari, Ghamdam Nasser, Nada Alghaithy, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Hussein Ali Yafai, S.A., G.H.A., Anhar Abdullah Taher, A.A., Tawfik Rajeh, Jamilah Ali, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Atef Rajeh, H.W.M.Q. (2), Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Somayah Al Najar, Mutei Al Ghazali, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Saba Al Harmi, M.M.N.A., Mona Abass Zabara, Abdasalam Saeed, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Saqr Al-Nomair, Norh A. Ahmed, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Abdelbaset Ali, Diana Arevalo, Siham Rajeh, Geab Saeed, Kawkab Al Malki, B.H.A., Saeed Sharif, Mokhtar Nasser, Esmayl Algazali, Kubla Moshin, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, A.R., Mar Abdo Kaid, Ali Abdo Saleh, Mohamed Qasem, Amr Aldaylam, Mansour Mohamed, S.H.A., Nabila Alhanash, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Majdy Alharbi, Amal Almansouri, Saman Al-Gaad, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Ghaithah Sharoh, Latifiya Algazali, Abdo Ali Saleh. All Defendants. (Goldberg, Julie)
February 19, 2019 Filing 56 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ahlam Hauter, Abdulrakib Abashaar, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Amin El Burati, Amal Al-Okam, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Hilal Al-Nomair, H.W.M.Q., Naif Al Najar, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Fayzah Abdullah, F.S., Suriah Mohamed Muthana, M.A., Emtethal Al-Nomair, Etidal Alkuaif, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Arwa Saleh, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Faisal Algudari, Ghamdam Nasser, Nada Alghaithy, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Hussein Ali Yafai, S.A., G.H.A., Anhar Abdullah Taher, A.A., Tawfik Rajeh, Jamilah Ali, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Atef Rajeh, H.W.M.Q. (2), Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Somayah Al Najar, Mutei Al Ghazali, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Saba Al Harmi, M.M.N.A., Mona Abass Zabara, Abdasalam Saeed, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Saqr Al-Nomair, Norh A. Ahmed, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Abdelbaset Ali, Diana Arevalo, Siham Rajeh, Geab Saeed, Kawkab Al Malki, B.H.A., Saeed Sharif, Mokhtar Nasser, Esmayl Algazali, Kubla Moshin, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, A.R., Mar Abdo Kaid, Ali Abdo Saleh, Mohamed Qasem, Amr Aldaylam, Mansour Mohamed, S.H.A., Nabila Alhanash, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Majdy Alharbi, Amal Almansouri, Saman Al-Gaad, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Ghaithah Sharoh, Latifiya Algazali, Abdo Ali Saleh. Matthew Whitaker served on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Goldberg, Julie)
February 19, 2019 Filing 55 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ahlam Hauter, Abdulrakib Abashaar, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Amin El Burati, Amal Al-Okam, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Hilal Al-Nomair, H.W.M.Q., Naif Al Najar, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Fayzah Abdullah, F.S., Suriah Mohamed Muthana, M.A., Emtethal Al-Nomair, Etidal Alkuaif, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Arwa Saleh, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Faisal Algudari, Ghamdam Nasser, Nada Alghaithy, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Hussein Ali Yafai, S.A., G.H.A., Anhar Abdullah Taher, A.A., Tawfik Rajeh, Jamilah Ali, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Atef Rajeh, H.W.M.Q. (2), Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Somayah Al Najar, Mutei Al Ghazali, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Saba Al Harmi, M.M.N.A., Mona Abass Zabara, Abdasalam Saeed, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Saqr Al-Nomair, Norh A. Ahmed, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Abdelbaset Ali, Diana Arevalo, Siham Rajeh, Geab Saeed, Kawkab Al Malki, B.H.A., Saeed Sharif, Mokhtar Nasser, Esmayl Algazali, Kubla Moshin, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, A.R., Mar Abdo Kaid, Ali Abdo Saleh, Mohamed Qasem, Amr Aldaylam, Mansour Mohamed, S.H.A., Nabila Alhanash, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Majdy Alharbi, Amal Almansouri, Saman Al-Gaad, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Ghaithah Sharoh, Latifiya Algazali, Abdo Ali Saleh. U.S. Embassy in Djibouti served on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Goldberg, Julie)
February 19, 2019 Filing 54 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ahlam Hauter, Abdulrakib Abashaar, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Amin El Burati, Amal Al-Okam, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Hilal Al-Nomair, H.W.M.Q., Naif Al Najar, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Fayzah Abdullah, F.S., Suriah Mohamed Muthana, M.A., Emtethal Al-Nomair, Etidal Alkuaif, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Arwa Saleh, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Faisal Algudari, Ghamdam Nasser, Nada Alghaithy, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Hussein Ali Yafai, S.A., G.H.A., Anhar Abdullah Taher, A.A., Tawfik Rajeh, Jamilah Ali, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Atef Rajeh, H.W.M.Q. (2), Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Somayah Al Najar, Mutei Al Ghazali, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Saba Al Harmi, M.M.N.A., Mona Abass Zabara, Abdasalam Saeed, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Saqr Al-Nomair, Norh A. Ahmed, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Abdelbaset Ali, Diana Arevalo, Siham Rajeh, Geab Saeed, Kawkab Al Malki, B.H.A., Saeed Sharif, Mokhtar Nasser, Esmayl Algazali, Kubla Moshin, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, A.R., Mar Abdo Kaid, Ali Abdo Saleh, Mohamed Qasem, Amr Aldaylam, Mansour Mohamed, S.H.A., Nabila Alhanash, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Majdy Alharbi, Amal Almansouri, Saman Al-Gaad, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Ghaithah Sharoh, Latifiya Algazali, Abdo Ali Saleh. Trump J. Donald served on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Goldberg, Julie)
February 19, 2019 Filing 53 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ahlam Hauter, Abdulrakib Abashaar, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Amin El Burati, Amal Al-Okam, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Hilal Al-Nomair, H.W.M.Q., Naif Al Najar, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Fayzah Abdullah, F.S., Suriah Mohamed Muthana, M.A., Emtethal Al-Nomair, Etidal Alkuaif, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Arwa Saleh, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Faisal Algudari, Ghamdam Nasser, Nada Alghaithy, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Hussein Ali Yafai, S.A., G.H.A., Anhar Abdullah Taher, A.A., Tawfik Rajeh, Jamilah Ali, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Atef Rajeh, H.W.M.Q. (2), Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Somayah Al Najar, Mutei Al Ghazali, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Saba Al Harmi, M.M.N.A., Mona Abass Zabara, Abdasalam Saeed, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Saqr Al-Nomair, Norh A. Ahmed, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Abdelbaset Ali, Diana Arevalo, Siham Rajeh, Geab Saeed, Kawkab Al Malki, B.H.A., Saeed Sharif, Mokhtar Nasser, Esmayl Algazali, Kubla Moshin, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, A.R., Mar Abdo Kaid, Ali Abdo Saleh, Mohamed Qasem, Amr Aldaylam, Mansour Mohamed, S.H.A., Nabila Alhanash, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Majdy Alharbi, Amal Almansouri, Saman Al-Gaad, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Ghaithah Sharoh, Latifiya Algazali, Abdo Ali Saleh. Michael Pompeo served on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Goldberg, Julie)
February 19, 2019 Filing 52 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ahlam Hauter, Abdulrakib Abashaar, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Amin El Burati, Amal Al-Okam, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Hilal Al-Nomair, H.W.M.Q., Naif Al Najar, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Fayzah Abdullah, F.S., Suriah Mohamed Muthana, M.A., Emtethal Al-Nomair, Etidal Alkuaif, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Arwa Saleh, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Faisal Algudari, Ghamdam Nasser, Nada Alghaithy, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Hussein Ali Yafai, S.A., G.H.A., Anhar Abdullah Taher, A.A., Tawfik Rajeh, Jamilah Ali, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Atef Rajeh, H.W.M.Q. (2), Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Somayah Al Najar, Mutei Al Ghazali, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Saba Al Harmi, M.M.N.A., Mona Abass Zabara, Abdasalam Saeed, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Saqr Al-Nomair, Norh A. Ahmed, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Abdelbaset Ali, Diana Arevalo, Siham Rajeh, Geab Saeed, Kawkab Al Malki, B.H.A., Saeed Sharif, Mokhtar Nasser, Esmayl Algazali, Kubla Moshin, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, A.R., Mar Abdo Kaid, Ali Abdo Saleh, Mohamed Qasem, Amr Aldaylam, Mansour Mohamed, S.H.A., Nabila Alhanash, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Majdy Alharbi, Amal Almansouri, Saman Al-Gaad, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Ghaithah Sharoh, Latifiya Algazali, Abdo Ali Saleh. Office of the Director of National Intelligence served on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Goldberg, Julie)
February 19, 2019 Filing 51 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ahlam Hauter, Abdulrakib Abashaar, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Amin El Burati, Amal Al-Okam, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Hilal Al-Nomair, H.W.M.Q., Naif Al Najar, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Fayzah Abdullah, F.S., Suriah Mohamed Muthana, M.A., Emtethal Al-Nomair, Etidal Alkuaif, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Arwa Saleh, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Faisal Algudari, Ghamdam Nasser, Nada Alghaithy, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Hussein Ali Yafai, S.A., G.H.A., Anhar Abdullah Taher, A.A., Tawfik Rajeh, Jamilah Ali, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Atef Rajeh, H.W.M.Q. (2), Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Somayah Al Najar, Mutei Al Ghazali, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Saba Al Harmi, M.M.N.A., Mona Abass Zabara, Abdasalam Saeed, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Saqr Al-Nomair, Norh A. Ahmed, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Abdelbaset Ali, Diana Arevalo, Siham Rajeh, Geab Saeed, Kawkab Al Malki, B.H.A., Saeed Sharif, Mokhtar Nasser, Esmayl Algazali, Kubla Moshin, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, A.R., Mar Abdo Kaid, Ali Abdo Saleh, Mohamed Qasem, Amr Aldaylam, Mansour Mohamed, S.H.A., Nabila Alhanash, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Majdy Alharbi, Amal Almansouri, Saman Al-Gaad, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Ghaithah Sharoh, Latifiya Algazali, Abdo Ali Saleh. Ryan Nolan served on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Goldberg, Julie)
February 19, 2019 Filing 50 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ahlam Hauter, Abdulrakib Abashaar, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Amin El Burati, Amal Al-Okam, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Hilal Al-Nomair, H.W.M.Q., Naif Al Najar, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Fayzah Abdullah, F.S., Suriah Mohamed Muthana, M.A., Emtethal Al-Nomair, Etidal Alkuaif, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Arwa Saleh, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Faisal Algudari, Ghamdam Nasser, Nada Alghaithy, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Hussein Ali Yafai, S.A., G.H.A., Anhar Abdullah Taher, A.A., Tawfik Rajeh, Jamilah Ali, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Atef Rajeh, H.W.M.Q. (2), Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Somayah Al Najar, Mutei Al Ghazali, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Saba Al Harmi, M.M.N.A., Mona Abass Zabara, Abdasalam Saeed, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Saqr Al-Nomair, Norh A. Ahmed, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Abdelbaset Ali, Diana Arevalo, Siham Rajeh, Geab Saeed, Kawkab Al Malki, B.H.A., Saeed Sharif, Mokhtar Nasser, Esmayl Algazali, Kubla Moshin, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, A.R., Mar Abdo Kaid, Ali Abdo Saleh, Mohamed Qasem, Amr Aldaylam, Mansour Mohamed, S.H.A., Nabila Alhanash, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Majdy Alharbi, Amal Almansouri, Saman Al-Gaad, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Ghaithah Sharoh, Latifiya Algazali, Abdo Ali Saleh. Kirstjen Nielsen served on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Goldberg, Julie)
February 19, 2019 Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ahlam Hauter, Abdulrakib Abashaar, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Amin El Burati, Amal Al-Okam, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Hilal Al-Nomair, H.W.M.Q., Naif Al Najar, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Fayzah Abdullah, F.S., Suriah Mohamed Muthana, M.A., Emtethal Al-Nomair, Etidal Alkuaif, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Arwa Saleh, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Faisal Algudari, Ghamdam Nasser, Nada Alghaithy, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Hussein Ali Yafai, S.A., G.H.A., Anhar Abdullah Taher, A.A., Tawfik Rajeh, Jamilah Ali, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Atef Rajeh, H.W.M.Q. (2), Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Somayah Al Najar, Mutei Al Ghazali, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Saba Al Harmi, M.M.N.A., Mona Abass Zabara, Abdasalam Saeed, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Saqr Al-Nomair, Norh A. Ahmed, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Abdelbaset Ali, Diana Arevalo, Siham Rajeh, Geab Saeed, Kawkab Al Malki, B.H.A., Saeed Sharif, Mokhtar Nasser, Esmayl Algazali, Kubla Moshin, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, A.R., Mar Abdo Kaid, Ali Abdo Saleh, Mohamed Qasem, Amr Aldaylam, Mansour Mohamed, S.H.A., Nabila Alhanash, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Majdy Alharbi, Amal Almansouri, Saman Al-Gaad, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Ghaithah Sharoh, Latifiya Algazali, Abdo Ali Saleh. Devin Kennington served on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Goldberg, Julie)
February 19, 2019 Filing 48 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ahlam Hauter, Abdulrakib Abashaar, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Amin El Burati, Amal Al-Okam, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Hilal Al-Nomair, H.W.M.Q., Naif Al Najar, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Fayzah Abdullah, F.S., Suriah Mohamed Muthana, M.A., Emtethal Al-Nomair, Etidal Alkuaif, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Arwa Saleh, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Faisal Algudari, Ghamdam Nasser, Nada Alghaithy, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Hussein Ali Yafai, S.A., G.H.A., Anhar Abdullah Taher, A.A., Tawfik Rajeh, Jamilah Ali, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Atef Rajeh, H.W.M.Q. (2), Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Somayah Al Najar, Mutei Al Ghazali, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Saba Al Harmi, M.M.N.A., Mona Abass Zabara, Abdasalam Saeed, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Saqr Al-Nomair, Norh A. Ahmed, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Abdelbaset Ali, Diana Arevalo, Siham Rajeh, Geab Saeed, Kawkab Al Malki, B.H.A., Saeed Sharif, Mokhtar Nasser, Esmayl Algazali, Kubla Moshin, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, A.R., Mar Abdo Kaid, Ali Abdo Saleh, Mohamed Qasem, Amr Aldaylam, Mansour Mohamed, S.H.A., Nabila Alhanash, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Majdy Alharbi, Amal Almansouri, Saman Al-Gaad, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Ghaithah Sharoh, Latifiya Algazali, Abdo Ali Saleh. Chapman Godbey served on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Goldberg, Julie)
February 19, 2019 Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ahlam Hauter, Abdulrakib Abashaar, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Amin El Burati, Amal Al-Okam, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Hilal Al-Nomair, H.W.M.Q., Naif Al Najar, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Fayzah Abdullah, F.S., Suriah Mohamed Muthana, M.A., Emtethal Al-Nomair, Etidal Alkuaif, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Arwa Saleh, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Faisal Algudari, Ghamdam Nasser, Nada Alghaithy, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Hussein Ali Yafai, S.A., G.H.A., Anhar Abdullah Taher, A.A., Tawfik Rajeh, Jamilah Ali, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Atef Rajeh, H.W.M.Q. (2), Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Somayah Al Najar, Mutei Al Ghazali, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Saba Al Harmi, M.M.N.A., Mona Abass Zabara, Abdasalam Saeed, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Saqr Al-Nomair, Norh A. Ahmed, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Abdelbaset Ali, Diana Arevalo, Siham Rajeh, Geab Saeed, Kawkab Al Malki, B.H.A., Saeed Sharif, Mokhtar Nasser, Esmayl Algazali, Kubla Moshin, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, A.R., Mar Abdo Kaid, Ali Abdo Saleh, Mohamed Qasem, Amr Aldaylam, Mansour Mohamed, S.H.A., Nabila Alhanash, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Majdy Alharbi, Amal Almansouri, Saman Al-Gaad, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Ghaithah Sharoh, Latifiya Algazali, Abdo Ali Saleh. U.S. Department of Justice served on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Goldberg, Julie)
February 19, 2019 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ahlam Hauter, Abdulrakib Abashaar, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Amin El Burati, Amal Al-Okam, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Hilal Al-Nomair, H.W.M.Q., Naif Al Najar, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Fayzah Abdullah, F.S., Suriah Mohamed Muthana, M.A., Emtethal Al-Nomair, Etidal Alkuaif, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Arwa Saleh, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Faisal Algudari, Ghamdam Nasser, Nada Alghaithy, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Hussein Ali Yafai, S.A., G.H.A., Anhar Abdullah Taher, A.A., Tawfik Rajeh, Jamilah Ali, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Atef Rajeh, H.W.M.Q. (2), Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Somayah Al Najar, Mutei Al Ghazali, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Saba Al Harmi, M.M.N.A., Mona Abass Zabara, Abdasalam Saeed, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Saqr Al-Nomair, Norh A. Ahmed, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Abdelbaset Ali, Diana Arevalo, Siham Rajeh, Geab Saeed, Kawkab Al Malki, B.H.A., Saeed Sharif, Mokhtar Nasser, Esmayl Algazali, Kubla Moshin, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, A.R., Mar Abdo Kaid, Ali Abdo Saleh, Mohamed Qasem, Amr Aldaylam, Mansour Mohamed, S.H.A., Nabila Alhanash, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Majdy Alharbi, Amal Almansouri, Saman Al-Gaad, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Ghaithah Sharoh, Latifiya Algazali, Abdo Ali Saleh. U.S. Department of Homeland Security ("DHS") served on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Goldberg, Julie)
February 19, 2019 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ahlam Hauter, Abdulrakib Abashaar, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Amin El Burati, Amal Al-Okam, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Hilal Al-Nomair, H.W.M.Q., Naif Al Najar, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Fayzah Abdullah, F.S., Suriah Mohamed Muthana, M.A., Emtethal Al-Nomair, Etidal Alkuaif, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Arwa Saleh, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Faisal Algudari, Ghamdam Nasser, Nada Alghaithy, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Hussein Ali Yafai, S.A., G.H.A., Anhar Abdullah Taher, A.A., Tawfik Rajeh, Jamilah Ali, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Atef Rajeh, H.W.M.Q. (2), Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Somayah Al Najar, Mutei Al Ghazali, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Saba Al Harmi, M.M.N.A., Mona Abass Zabara, Abdasalam Saeed, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Saqr Al-Nomair, Norh A. Ahmed, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Abdelbaset Ali, Diana Arevalo, Siham Rajeh, Geab Saeed, Kawkab Al Malki, B.H.A., Saeed Sharif, Mokhtar Nasser, Esmayl Algazali, Kubla Moshin, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, A.R., Mar Abdo Kaid, Ali Abdo Saleh, Mohamed Qasem, Amr Aldaylam, Mansour Mohamed, S.H.A., Nabila Alhanash, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Majdy Alharbi, Amal Almansouri, Saman Al-Gaad, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Ghaithah Sharoh, Latifiya Algazali, Abdo Ali Saleh. U.S. Department of State served on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Goldberg, Julie)
February 19, 2019 Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ahlam Hauter, Abdulrakib Abashaar, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Amin El Burati, Amal Al-Okam, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Hilal Al-Nomair, H.W.M.Q., Naif Al Najar, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Fayzah Abdullah, F.S., Suriah Mohamed Muthana, M.A., Emtethal Al-Nomair, Etidal Alkuaif, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Arwa Saleh, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Faisal Algudari, Ghamdam Nasser, Nada Alghaithy, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Hussein Ali Yafai, S.A., G.H.A., Anhar Abdullah Taher, A.A., Tawfik Rajeh, Jamilah Ali, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Atef Rajeh, H.W.M.Q. (2), Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Somayah Al Najar, Mutei Al Ghazali, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Saba Al Harmi, M.M.N.A., Mona Abass Zabara, Abdasalam Saeed, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Saqr Al-Nomair, Norh A. Ahmed, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Abdelbaset Ali, Diana Arevalo, Siham Rajeh, Geab Saeed, Kawkab Al Malki, B.H.A., Saeed Sharif, Mokhtar Nasser, Esmayl Algazali, Kubla Moshin, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, A.R., Mar Abdo Kaid, Ali Abdo Saleh, Mohamed Qasem, Amr Aldaylam, Mansour Mohamed, S.H.A., Nabila Alhanash, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Majdy Alharbi, Amal Almansouri, Saman Al-Gaad, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Ghaithah Sharoh, Latifiya Algazali, Abdo Ali Saleh. Daniel Coats served on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Goldberg, Julie)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER re #39 Letter, filed by U.S. Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, U.S. Department of Justice, Daniel Coats, Chapman Godbey, U.S. Embassy in Djibouti, U.S. Department of Homeland Security ("DHS"), Kirstjen Nielsen, Matthew Whitaker, Ryan Nolan, Trump J. Donald, Michael Pompeo. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion to quash subpoenas sent by Plaintiffs, ECF No. 39, is hereby GRANTED. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 2/19/2019. (Jackson, Andrew)
February 19, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Suryia Rahman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Rahman, Suryia)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #40 Motion to Appear by Telephone without prejudice to renewal at an appropriate time under proper notice to all parties. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 2/19/2019. (Kuntz, William)
February 19, 2019 Filing 40 Second MOTION to Appear by Telephone and Video for Witnesses Central to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by A.A., A.R., Abdulrakib Abashaar, Fayzah Abdullah, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Norh A. Ahmed, Mutei Al Ghazali, Saba Al Harmi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Kawkab Al Malki, Somayah Al Najar, Naif Al Najar, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Saman Al-Gaad, Emtethal Al-Nomair, Hilal Al-Nomair, Saqr Al-Nomair, Amal Al-Okam, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Amr Aldaylam, Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Esmayl Algazali, Latifiya Algazali, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Nada Alghaithy, Faisal Algudari, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Nabila Alhanash, Majdy Alharbi, Abdelbaset Ali, Jamilah Ali, Etidal Alkuaif, Amal Almansouri, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Diana Arevalo, B.H.A., Amin El Burati, F.S., G.H.A., H.W.M.Q., H.W.M.Q. (2), Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Ahlam Hauter, Mar Abdo Kaid, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, M.A., M.M.N.A., Mansour Mohamed, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Kubla Moshin, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Suriah Mohamed Muthana, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Ghamdam Nasser, Mokhtar Nasser, Mohamed Qasem, Siham Rajeh, Tawfik Rajeh, Atef Rajeh, S.A., S.H.A., Abdasalam Saeed, Geab Saeed, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Abdo Ali Saleh, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Ali Abdo Saleh, Arwa Saleh, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Saeed Sharif, Ghaithah Sharoh, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Anhar Abdullah Taher, Hussein Ali Yafai, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Mona Abass Zabara. (Goldberg, Julie)
February 18, 2019 Filing 39 Letter re: Motion to Quash Subpoenas by Daniel Coats, Trump J. Donald, Chapman Godbey, Kirstjen Nielsen, Ryan Nolan, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Michael Pompeo, U.S. Department of Homeland Security ("DHS"), U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Embassy in Djibouti, Matthew Whitaker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Devon Sells subpoena, #2 Exhibit Brian Kennington subpoena) (Ramkumar, Archith)
February 18, 2019 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #24 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Ramkumar, Archith)
February 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #36 Motion to Seal Document. The Court directs Counsel for the Plaintiffs to comply with the Rules of the Office of the Clerk of This Court for the proper filing under seal of documents on a nunc pro tunc basis. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 2/18/2019. (Kuntz, William)
February 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #35 Motion to Appear by Telephone. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 2/18/2019. (Kuntz, William)
February 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 2/18/2019. (Kuntz, William) (Jackson, Andrew).
February 18, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Gisela Westwater on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Westwater, Gisela)
February 17, 2019 Filing 36 Emergency MOTION to Seal Document #27 Exhibit,, #28 Exhibit,, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, Exhibits to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction Previously Filed by the Clerk on February 12, 2019 by A.A., A.R., Abdulrakib Abashaar, Fayzah Abdullah, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Norh A. Ahmed, Mutei Al Ghazali, Saba Al Harmi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Kawkab Al Malki, Somayah Al Najar, Naif Al Najar, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Saman Al-Gaad, Emtethal Al-Nomair, Hilal Al-Nomair, Saqr Al-Nomair, Amal Al-Okam, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Amr Aldaylam, Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Esmayl Algazali, Latifiya Algazali, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Nada Alghaithy, Faisal Algudari, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Nabila Alhanash, Majdy Alharbi, Abdelbaset Ali, Jamilah Ali, Etidal Alkuaif, Amal Almansouri, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Diana Arevalo, B.H.A., Amin El Burati, F.S., G.H.A., H.W.M.Q., H.W.M.Q. (2), Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Ahlam Hauter, Mar Abdo Kaid, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, M.A., M.M.N.A., Mansour Mohamed, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Kubla Moshin, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Suriah Mohamed Muthana, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Ghamdam Nasser, Mokhtar Nasser, Mohamed Qasem, Siham Rajeh, Tawfik Rajeh, Atef Rajeh, S.A., S.H.A., Abdasalam Saeed, Geab Saeed, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Abdo Ali Saleh, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Ali Abdo Saleh, Arwa Saleh, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Saeed Sharif, Ghaithah Sharoh, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Anhar Abdullah Taher, Hussein Ali Yafai, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Mona Abass Zabara. (Goldberg, Julie)
February 17, 2019 Filing 35 First MOTION to Appear by Telephone and Video for Witnesses by A.A., A.R., Abdulrakib Abashaar, Fayzah Abdullah, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Norh A. Ahmed, Mutei Al Ghazali, Saba Al Harmi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Kawkab Al Malki, Somayah Al Najar, Naif Al Najar, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Saman Al-Gaad, Emtethal Al-Nomair, Hilal Al-Nomair, Saqr Al-Nomair, Amal Al-Okam, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Amr Aldaylam, Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Esmayl Algazali, Latifiya Algazali, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Nada Alghaithy, Faisal Algudari, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Nabila Alhanash, Majdy Alharbi, Abdelbaset Ali, Jamilah Ali, Etidal Alkuaif, Amal Almansouri, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Diana Arevalo, B.H.A., Amin El Burati, F.S., G.H.A., H.W.M.Q., H.W.M.Q. (2), Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Ahlam Hauter, Mar Abdo Kaid, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, M.A., M.M.N.A., Mansour Mohamed, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Kubla Moshin, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Suriah Mohamed Muthana, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Ghamdam Nasser, Mokhtar Nasser, Mohamed Qasem, Siham Rajeh, Tawfik Rajeh, Atef Rajeh, S.A., S.H.A., Abdasalam Saeed, Geab Saeed, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Abdo Ali Saleh, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Ali Abdo Saleh, Arwa Saleh, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Saeed Sharif, Ghaithah Sharoh, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Anhar Abdullah Taher, Hussein Ali Yafai, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Mona Abass Zabara. (Goldberg, Julie)
February 16, 2019 Filing 34 Subpoena by A.A., A.R., Abdulrakib Abashaar, Fayzah Abdullah, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Norh A. Ahmed, Mutei Al Ghazali, Saba Al Harmi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Kawkab Al Malki, Somayah Al Najar, Naif Al Najar, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Saman Al-Gaad, Emtethal Al-Nomair, Hilal Al-Nomair, Saqr Al-Nomair, Amal Al-Okam, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Amr Aldaylam, Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Esmayl Algazali, Latifiya Algazali, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Nada Alghaithy, Faisal Algudari, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Nabila Alhanash, Majdy Alharbi, Abdelbaset Ali, Jamilah Ali, Etidal Alkuaif, Amal Almansouri, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Diana Arevalo, B.H.A., Amin El Burati, F.S., G.H.A., H.W.M.Q., H.W.M.Q. (2), Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Ahlam Hauter, Mar Abdo Kaid, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, M.A., M.M.N.A., Mansour Mohamed, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Kubla Moshin, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Suriah Mohamed Muthana, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Ghamdam Nasser, Mokhtar Nasser, Mohamed Qasem, Siham Rajeh, Tawfik Rajeh, Atef Rajeh, S.A., S.H.A., Abdasalam Saeed, Geab Saeed, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Abdo Ali Saleh, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Ali Abdo Saleh, Arwa Saleh, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Saeed Sharif, Ghaithah Sharoh, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Anhar Abdullah Taher, Hussein Ali Yafai, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Mona Abass Zabara. (Goldberg, Julie)
February 16, 2019 Filing 33 Subpoena by A.A., A.R., Abdulrakib Abashaar, Fayzah Abdullah, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Norh A. Ahmed, Mutei Al Ghazali, Saba Al Harmi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Kawkab Al Malki, Somayah Al Najar, Naif Al Najar, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Saman Al-Gaad, Emtethal Al-Nomair, Hilal Al-Nomair, Saqr Al-Nomair, Amal Al-Okam, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Amr Aldaylam, Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Esmayl Algazali, Latifiya Algazali, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Nada Alghaithy, Faisal Algudari, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Nabila Alhanash, Majdy Alharbi, Abdelbaset Ali, Jamilah Ali, Etidal Alkuaif, Amal Almansouri, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Diana Arevalo, B.H.A., Amin El Burati, F.S., G.H.A., H.W.M.Q., H.W.M.Q. (2), Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Ahlam Hauter, Mar Abdo Kaid, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, M.A., M.M.N.A., Mansour Mohamed, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Kubla Moshin, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Suriah Mohamed Muthana, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Ghamdam Nasser, Mokhtar Nasser, Mohamed Qasem, Siham Rajeh, Tawfik Rajeh, Atef Rajeh, S.A., S.H.A., Abdasalam Saeed, Geab Saeed, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Abdo Ali Saleh, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Ali Abdo Saleh, Arwa Saleh, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Saeed Sharif, Ghaithah Sharoh, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Anhar Abdullah Taher, Hussein Ali Yafai, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Mona Abass Zabara. (Goldberg, Julie)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying #22 Motion to Adjourn Conference. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the motion to adjourn conference submitted by Defendants is hereby DENIED without prejudice. The parties are instructed to appear for a preliminary injunction hearing on Tuesday, February 19, 2019, at 2:00 P.M. before the Honorable William F. Kuntz, II, in Courtroom 6H North. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 2/15/2019. (Jackson, Andrew)
February 15, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 First MOTION to Adjourn Conference endorsement of proposed briefing schedule filed by A.A., A.R., Abdulrakib Abashaar, Fayzah Abdullah, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Norh A. Ahmed, Mutei Al Ghazali, Saba Al Harmi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Kawkab Al Malki, Somayah Al Najar, Naif Al Najar, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Saman Al-Gaad, Emtethal Al-Nomair, Hilal Al-Nomair, Saqr Al-Nomair, Amal Al-Okam, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Amr Aldaylam, Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Esmayl Algazali, Latifiya Algazali, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Nada Alghaithy, Faisal Algudari, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Nabila Alhanash, Majdy Alharbi, Abdelbaset Ali, Jamilah Ali, Etidal Alkuaif, Amal Almansouri, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Diana Arevalo, B.H.A., Amin El Burati, F.S., G.H.A., H.W.M.Q., H.W.M.Q. (2), Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Ahlam Hauter, Mar Abdo Kaid, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, M.A., M.M.N.A., Mansour Mohamed, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Kubla Moshin, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Suriah Mohamed Muthana, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Ghamdam Nasser, Mokhtar Nasser, Mohamed Qasem, Siham Rajeh, Tawfik Rajeh, Atef Rajeh, S.A., S.H.A., Abdasalam Saeed, Geab Saeed, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Abdo Ali Saleh, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Ali Abdo Saleh, Arwa Saleh, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Saeed Sharif, Ghaithah Sharoh, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Anhar Abdullah Taher, Hussein Ali Yafai, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Mona Abass Zabara. (Attachments: #1 Transcript 02/12/2019) (Goldberg, Julie)
February 14, 2019 Filing 23 Notice of Related Case (Ramkumar, Archith)
February 14, 2019 Filing 22 First MOTION to Adjourn Conference endorsement of proposed briefing schedule by Daniel Coats, Trump J. Donald, Chapman Godbey, Devin Kennington, Kirstjen Nielsen, Ryan Nolan, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Michael Pompeo, U.S. Department of Homeland Security ("DHS"), U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Embassy in Djibouti, Matthew Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 TRO Hearing Transcript) (Ramkumar, Archith)
February 14, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Archith Ramkumar on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Ramkumar, Archith)
February 13, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Farzin Franklin Amanat on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Amanat, Farzin)
February 13, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Trump J. Donald, Ryan Nolan, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Michael Pompeo, U.S. Embassy in Djibouti, Matthew Whitaker, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II for all further proceedings. Judge Allyne R. Ross no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 2/13/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 13, 2019 Filing 18 Proposed Summons. by A.A., A.R., Abdulrakib Abashaar, Fayzah Abdullah, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Norh A. Ahmed, Mutei Al Ghazali, Saba Al Harmi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Kawkab Al Malki, Somayah Al Najar, Naif Al Najar, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Saman Al-Gaad, Emtethal Al-Nomair, Hilal Al-Nomair, Saqr Al-Nomair, Amal Al-Okam, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Amr Aldaylam, Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Esmayl Algazali, Latifiya Algazali, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Nada Alghaithy, Faisal Algudari, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Nabila Alhanash, Majdy Alharbi, Abdelbaset Ali, Jamilah Ali, Etidal Alkuaif, Amal Almansouri, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Diana Arevalo, B.H.A., Amin El Burati, F.S., G.H.A., H.W.M.Q., H.W.M.Q. (2), Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Ahlam Hauter, Mar Abdo Kaid, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, M.A., M.M.N.A., Mansour Mohamed, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Kubla Moshin, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Suriah Mohamed Muthana, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Ghamdam Nasser, Mokhtar Nasser, Mohamed Qasem, Siham Rajeh, Tawfik Rajeh, Atef Rajeh, S.A., S.H.A., Abdasalam Saeed, Geab Saeed, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Abdo Ali Saleh, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Ali Abdo Saleh, Arwa Saleh, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Saeed Sharif, Ghaithah Sharoh, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Anhar Abdullah Taher, Hussein Ali Yafai, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Mona Abass Zabara (Goldberg, Julie)
February 13, 2019 Filing 17 Proposed Summons. by A.A., A.R., Abdulrakib Abashaar, Fayzah Abdullah, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Norh A. Ahmed, Mutei Al Ghazali, Saba Al Harmi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Kawkab Al Malki, Somayah Al Najar, Naif Al Najar, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Saman Al-Gaad, Emtethal Al-Nomair, Hilal Al-Nomair, Saqr Al-Nomair, Amal Al-Okam, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Amr Aldaylam, Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Esmayl Algazali, Latifiya Algazali, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Nada Alghaithy, Faisal Algudari, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Nabila Alhanash, Majdy Alharbi, Abdelbaset Ali, Jamilah Ali, Etidal Alkuaif, Amal Almansouri, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Diana Arevalo, B.H.A., Amin El Burati, F.S., G.H.A., H.W.M.Q., H.W.M.Q. (2), Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Ahlam Hauter, Mar Abdo Kaid, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, M.A., M.M.N.A., Mansour Mohamed, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Kubla Moshin, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Suriah Mohamed Muthana, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Ghamdam Nasser, Mokhtar Nasser, Mohamed Qasem, Siham Rajeh, Tawfik Rajeh, Atef Rajeh, S.A., S.H.A., Abdasalam Saeed, Geab Saeed, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Abdo Ali Saleh, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Ali Abdo Saleh, Arwa Saleh, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Saeed Sharif, Ghaithah Sharoh, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Anhar Abdullah Taher, Hussein Ali Yafai, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Mona Abass Zabara (Goldberg, Julie)
February 13, 2019 Filing 16 Proposed Summons. by A.A., A.R., Abdulrakib Abashaar, Fayzah Abdullah, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Norh A. Ahmed, Mutei Al Ghazali, Saba Al Harmi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Kawkab Al Malki, Somayah Al Najar, Naif Al Najar, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Saman Al-Gaad, Emtethal Al-Nomair, Hilal Al-Nomair, Saqr Al-Nomair, Amal Al-Okam, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Amr Aldaylam, Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Esmayl Algazali, Latifiya Algazali, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Nada Alghaithy, Faisal Algudari, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Nabila Alhanash, Majdy Alharbi, Abdelbaset Ali, Jamilah Ali, Etidal Alkuaif, Amal Almansouri, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Diana Arevalo, B.H.A., Amin El Burati, F.S., G.H.A., H.W.M.Q., H.W.M.Q. (2), Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Ahlam Hauter, Mar Abdo Kaid, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, M.A., M.M.N.A., Mansour Mohamed, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Kubla Moshin, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Suriah Mohamed Muthana, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Ghamdam Nasser, Mokhtar Nasser, Mohamed Qasem, Siham Rajeh, Tawfik Rajeh, Atef Rajeh, S.A., S.H.A., Abdasalam Saeed, Geab Saeed, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Abdo Ali Saleh, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Ali Abdo Saleh, Arwa Saleh, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Saeed Sharif, Ghaithah Sharoh, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Anhar Abdullah Taher, Hussein Ali Yafai, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Mona Abass Zabara (Goldberg, Julie)
February 13, 2019 Filing 15 Proposed Summons. by A.A., A.R., Abdulrakib Abashaar, Fayzah Abdullah, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Norh A. Ahmed, Mutei Al Ghazali, Saba Al Harmi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Kawkab Al Malki, Somayah Al Najar, Naif Al Najar, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Saman Al-Gaad, Emtethal Al-Nomair, Hilal Al-Nomair, Saqr Al-Nomair, Amal Al-Okam, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Amr Aldaylam, Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Esmayl Algazali, Latifiya Algazali, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Nada Alghaithy, Faisal Algudari, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Nabila Alhanash, Majdy Alharbi, Abdelbaset Ali, Jamilah Ali, Etidal Alkuaif, Amal Almansouri, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Diana Arevalo, B.H.A., Amin El Burati, F.S., G.H.A., H.W.M.Q., H.W.M.Q. (2), Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Ahlam Hauter, Mar Abdo Kaid, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, M.A., M.M.N.A., Mansour Mohamed, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Kubla Moshin, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Suriah Mohamed Muthana, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Ghamdam Nasser, Mokhtar Nasser, Mohamed Qasem, Siham Rajeh, Tawfik Rajeh, Atef Rajeh, S.A., S.H.A., Abdasalam Saeed, Geab Saeed, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Abdo Ali Saleh, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Ali Abdo Saleh, Arwa Saleh, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Saeed Sharif, Ghaithah Sharoh, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Anhar Abdullah Taher, Hussein Ali Yafai, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Mona Abass Zabara (Goldberg, Julie)
February 13, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed Summons. by A.A., A.R., Abdulrakib Abashaar, Fayzah Abdullah, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Norh A. Ahmed, Mutei Al Ghazali, Saba Al Harmi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Kawkab Al Malki, Somayah Al Najar, Naif Al Najar, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Saman Al-Gaad, Emtethal Al-Nomair, Hilal Al-Nomair, Saqr Al-Nomair, Amal Al-Okam, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Amr Aldaylam, Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Esmayl Algazali, Latifiya Algazali, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Nada Alghaithy, Faisal Algudari, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Nabila Alhanash, Majdy Alharbi, Abdelbaset Ali, Jamilah Ali, Etidal Alkuaif, Amal Almansouri, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Diana Arevalo, B.H.A., Amin El Burati, F.S., G.H.A., H.W.M.Q., H.W.M.Q. (2), Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Ahlam Hauter, Mar Abdo Kaid, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, M.A., M.M.N.A., Mansour Mohamed, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Kubla Moshin, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Suriah Mohamed Muthana, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Ghamdam Nasser, Mokhtar Nasser, Mohamed Qasem, Siham Rajeh, Tawfik Rajeh, Atef Rajeh, S.A., S.H.A., Abdasalam Saeed, Geab Saeed, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Abdo Ali Saleh, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Ali Abdo Saleh, Arwa Saleh, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Saeed Sharif, Ghaithah Sharoh, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Anhar Abdullah Taher, Hussein Ali Yafai, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Mona Abass Zabara (Goldberg, Julie)
February 13, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Summons. by A.A., A.R., Abdulrakib Abashaar, Fayzah Abdullah, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Norh A. Ahmed, Mutei Al Ghazali, Saba Al Harmi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Kawkab Al Malki, Somayah Al Najar, Naif Al Najar, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Saman Al-Gaad, Emtethal Al-Nomair, Hilal Al-Nomair, Saqr Al-Nomair, Amal Al-Okam, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Amr Aldaylam, Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Esmayl Algazali, Latifiya Algazali, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Nada Alghaithy, Faisal Algudari, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Nabila Alhanash, Majdy Alharbi, Abdelbaset Ali, Jamilah Ali, Etidal Alkuaif, Amal Almansouri, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Diana Arevalo, B.H.A., Amin El Burati, F.S., G.H.A., H.W.M.Q., H.W.M.Q. (2), Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Ahlam Hauter, Mar Abdo Kaid, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, M.A., M.M.N.A., Mansour Mohamed, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Kubla Moshin, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Suriah Mohamed Muthana, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Ghamdam Nasser, Mokhtar Nasser, Mohamed Qasem, Siham Rajeh, Tawfik Rajeh, Atef Rajeh, S.A., S.H.A., Abdasalam Saeed, Geab Saeed, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Abdo Ali Saleh, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Ali Abdo Saleh, Arwa Saleh, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Saeed Sharif, Ghaithah Sharoh, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Anhar Abdullah Taher, Hussein Ali Yafai, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Mona Abass Zabara (Goldberg, Julie)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross for all further proceedings. Judge Nina Gershon no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 2/13/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 12, 2019 Filing 30 EXHIBITS PPP- RRR by all Plaintiffs. Related document: #24 MOTION for Order to Show Cause, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by all Plaintiffs. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
February 12, 2019 Filing 29 EXHIBITS AAA-OOO by all Plaintiffs. Related document: #24 MOTION for Order to Show Cause, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by all Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits Cont., #2 Exhibits Cont., #3 Exhibits Cont., #4 Exhibits Cont., #5 Exhibits Cont.) (Tavarez, Jennifer)
February 12, 2019 Filing 28 EXHIBITS AA-ZZ by all Plaintiffs. Related document: #24 MOTION for Order to Show Cause, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by all Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits Cont., #2 Exhibits Cont., #3 Exhibits Cont., #4 Exhibits Cont., #5 Exhibits Cont., #6 Exhibits Cont., #7 Exhibits Cont., #8 Exhibits Cont., #9 Exhibits Cont., #10 Exhibits Cont.) (Tavarez, Jennifer) Modified on 2/15/2019 (Tavarez, Jennifer).
February 12, 2019 Filing 27 EXHIBITS A-Z by all Plaintiffs. Related document: #24 MOTION for Order to Show Cause, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by all Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits Cont., #2 Exhibits Cont., #3 Exhibits Cont., #4 Exhibits Cont., #5 Exhibits Cont., #6 Exhibits Cont., #7 Exhibits Cont., #8 Exhibits Cont., #9 Exhibits Cont., #10 Exhibits Cont., #11 Exhibits Cont., #12 Exhibits Cont., #13 Exhibits Cont., #14 Exhibits Cont., #15 Exhibits Cont., #16 Exhibits Cont., #17 Exhibits Cont.) (Tavarez, Jennifer)
February 12, 2019 Filing 26 EXHIBIT Supplemental Exhibit List by all Plaintiffs. Related document: #24 MOTION for Order to Show Cause, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by all Plaintiffs. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
February 12, 2019 Filing 25 EXHIBIT by A.A., A.R., Abdulrakib Abashaar, Fayzah Abdullah, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Norh A. Ahmed, Mutei Al Ghazali, Saba Al Harmi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Kawkab Al Malki, Somayah Al Najar, Naif Al Najar, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Saman Al-Gaad, Emtethal Al-Nomair, Hilal Al-Nomair, Saqr Al-Nomair, Amal Al-Okam, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Amr Aldaylam, Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Esmayl Algazali, Latifiya Algazali, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Nada Alghaithy, Faisal Algudari, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Nabila Alhanash, Majdy Alharbi, Abdelbaset Ali, Jamilah Ali, Etidal Alkuaif, Amal Almansouri, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Diana Arevalo, B.H.A., Amin El Burati, F.S., G.H.A., H.W.M.Q., H.W.M.Q. (2), Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Ahlam Hauter, Mar Abdo Kaid, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, M.A., M.M.N.A., Mansour Mohamed, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Kubla Moshin, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Suriah Mohamed Muthana, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Ghamdam Nasser, Mokhtar Nasser, Mohamed Qasem, Siham Rajeh, Tawfik Rajeh, Atef Rajeh, S.A., S.H.A., Abdasalam Saeed, Geab Saeed, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Abdo Ali Saleh, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Ali Abdo Saleh, Arwa Saleh, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Saeed Sharif, Ghaithah Sharoh, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Anhar Abdullah Taher, Hussein Ali Yafai, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Mona Abass Zabara. Related document: #24 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Amr Aldaylam, A.R., Abdlarzak Mohsin, Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Abdelbaset Ali, Norh A. Ahmed, S.A., Kawkab Al Malki, Atef Rajeh, Mansour Mohamed, H.W.M.Q., Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Saman Al-Gaad, Amal Almansouri, Siham Rajeh, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, A.A., Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Mona Abass Zabara, Abdo Ali Saleh, Etidal Alkuaif, Abdurahman Al Malki, F.S., Mohamed Taher Aldafri, B.H.A., Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Ali Abdo Saleh, Saeed Sharif, Arwa Saleh, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Saqr Al-Nomair, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Geab Saeed, Latifiya Algazali, Amin El Burati, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Naif Al Najar, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, M.A., Samerah Ahmed Musa, Fayzah Abdullah, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Jamilah Ali, Esmayl Algazali, Tawfik Rajeh, M.M.N.A., Saba Al Harmi, Mutei Al Ghazali, Nabila Alhanash, H.W.M.Q. (2), Amal Al-Okam, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Kubla Moshin, Nada Alghaithy, Suriah Mohamed Muthana, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Ahlam Hauter, Suood Almerdaei, S.H.A., Somayah Al Najar, Abdulrakib Abashaar, Hilal Al-Nomair, Anhar Abdullah Taher, Ghaithah Sharoh, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, G.H.A., Emtethal Al-Nomair, Mar Abdo Kaid, Abdasalam Saeed, Majdy Alharbi, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Faisal Algudari, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Mohamed Qasem, Ghamdam Nasser, Diana Arevalo, Hussein Ali Yafai, Mokhtar Nasser. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
February 12, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Order to Show Cause , MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by A.A., A.R., Abdulrakib Abashaar, Fayzah Abdullah, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Norh A. Ahmed, Mutei Al Ghazali, Saba Al Harmi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Kawkab Al Malki, Somayah Al Najar, Naif Al Najar, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Saman Al-Gaad, Emtethal Al-Nomair, Hilal Al-Nomair, Saqr Al-Nomair, Amal Al-Okam, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Amr Aldaylam, Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Esmayl Algazali, Latifiya Algazali, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Nada Alghaithy, Faisal Algudari, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Nabila Alhanash, Majdy Alharbi, Abdelbaset Ali, Jamilah Ali, Etidal Alkuaif, Amal Almansouri, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Diana Arevalo, B.H.A., Amin El Burati, F.S., G.H.A., H.W.M.Q., H.W.M.Q. (2), Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Ahlam Hauter, Mar Abdo Kaid, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, M.A., M.M.N.A., Mansour Mohamed, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Kubla Moshin, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Suriah Mohamed Muthana, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Ghamdam Nasser, Mokhtar Nasser, Mohamed Qasem, Siham Rajeh, Tawfik Rajeh, Atef Rajeh, S.A., S.H.A., Abdasalam Saeed, Geab Saeed, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Abdo Ali Saleh, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Ali Abdo Saleh, Arwa Saleh, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Saeed Sharif, Ghaithah Sharoh, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Anhar Abdullah Taher, Hussein Ali Yafai, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Mona Abass Zabara. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
February 12, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Daniel Coats, Chapman Godbey, Devin Kennington, Kirstjen Nielsen, U.S. Department of Homeland Security ("DHS"), U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 12, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. by A.A., A.R., Abdulrakib Abashaar, Fayzah Abdullah, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Norh A. Ahmed, Mutei Al Ghazali, Saba Al Harmi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Kawkab Al Malki, Somayah Al Najar, Naif Al Najar, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Saman Al-Gaad, Emtethal Al-Nomair, Hilal Al-Nomair, Saqr Al-Nomair, Amal Al-Okam, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Amr Aldaylam, Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Esmayl Algazali, Latifiya Algazali, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Nada Alghaithy, Faisal Algudari, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Nabila Alhanash, Majdy Alharbi, Abdelbaset Ali, Jamilah Ali, Etidal Alkuaif, Amal Almansouri, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Diana Arevalo, B.H.A., Amin El Burati, F.S., G.H.A., H.W.M.Q., H.W.M.Q. (2), Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Ahlam Hauter, Mar Abdo Kaid, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, M.A., M.M.N.A., Mansour Mohamed, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Kubla Moshin, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Suriah Mohamed Muthana, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Ghamdam Nasser, Mokhtar Nasser, Mohamed Qasem, Siham Rajeh, Tawfik Rajeh, Atef Rajeh, S.A., S.H.A., Abdasalam Saeed, Geab Saeed, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Abdo Ali Saleh, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Ali Abdo Saleh, Arwa Saleh, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Saeed Sharif, Ghaithah Sharoh, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Anhar Abdullah Taher, Hussein Ali Yafai, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Mona Abass Zabara (Goldberg, Julie)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. by A.A., A.R., Abdulrakib Abashaar, Fayzah Abdullah, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Norh A. Ahmed, Mutei Al Ghazali, Saba Al Harmi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Kawkab Al Malki, Somayah Al Najar, Naif Al Najar, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Saman Al-Gaad, Emtethal Al-Nomair, Hilal Al-Nomair, Saqr Al-Nomair, Amal Al-Okam, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Amr Aldaylam, Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Esmayl Algazali, Latifiya Algazali, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Nada Alghaithy, Faisal Algudari, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Nabila Alhanash, Majdy Alharbi, Abdelbaset Ali, Jamilah Ali, Etidal Alkuaif, Amal Almansouri, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Diana Arevalo, B.H.A., Amin El Burati, F.S., G.H.A., H.W.M.Q., H.W.M.Q. (2), Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Ahlam Hauter, Mar Abdo Kaid, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, M.A., M.M.N.A., Mansour Mohamed, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Kubla Moshin, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Suriah Mohamed Muthana, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Ghamdam Nasser, Mokhtar Nasser, Mohamed Qasem, Siham Rajeh, Tawfik Rajeh, Atef Rajeh, S.A., S.H.A., Abdasalam Saeed, Geab Saeed, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Abdo Ali Saleh, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Ali Abdo Saleh, Arwa Saleh, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Saeed Sharif, Ghaithah Sharoh, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Anhar Abdullah Taher, Hussein Ali Yafai, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Mona Abass Zabara (Goldberg, Julie)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY AND ORDER: On February 12, 2019, the Court held a hearing regarding Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order. Counsel for both parties appeared. The Court finds that Plaintiffs failed to establish that they were likely to suffer irreparable harm in the absence of a temporary restraining order. Nor is the Court confident that Plaintiffs can satisfy the heightened standard for success on the merits applicable to mandatory injunctions that would provide a movant with substantially all the relief sought. See Tom Doherty Assocs., Inc. v. Saban Entm't, Inc., 60 F.3d 27, 3435 (2d Cir. 1995). The Court, however, makes no finding with respect to Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction. The Court shall hold a preliminary injunction hearing on February 19, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. The briefing schedule for that hearing shall be set by the judge to whom this matter is ultimately assigned. Plaintiffs shall serve Defendants with copies of its complaint, its motion papers, and this order by tomorrow, February 13, 2019, at 5:30 p.m. (Court Reporter Lisa Schimd.) (Valentin, Winnethka)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. by A.A., A.R., Abdulrakib Abashaar, Fayzah Abdullah, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Norh A. Ahmed, Mutei Al Ghazali, Saba Al Harmi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Kawkab Al Malki, Somayah Al Najar, Naif Al Najar, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Saman Al-Gaad, Emtethal Al-Nomair, Hilal Al-Nomair, Saqr Al-Nomair, Amal Al-Okam, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Amr Aldaylam, Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Esmayl Algazali, Latifiya Algazali, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Nada Alghaithy, Faisal Algudari, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Nabila Alhanash, Majdy Alharbi, Abdelbaset Ali, Jamilah Ali, Etidal Alkuaif, Amal Almansouri, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Diana Arevalo, B.H.A., Amin El Burati, F.S., G.H.A., H.W.M.Q., H.W.M.Q. (2), Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Ahlam Hauter, Mar Abdo Kaid, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, M.A., M.M.N.A., Mansour Mohamed, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Kubla Moshin, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Suriah Mohamed Muthana, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Ghamdam Nasser, Mokhtar Nasser, Mohamed Qasem, Siham Rajeh, Tawfik Rajeh, Atef Rajeh, S.A., S.H.A., Abdasalam Saeed, Geab Saeed, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Abdo Ali Saleh, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Ali Abdo Saleh, Arwa Saleh, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Saeed Sharif, Ghaithah Sharoh, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Anhar Abdullah Taher, Hussein Ali Yafai, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Mona Abass Zabara (Goldberg, Julie)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. by A.A., A.R., Abdulrakib Abashaar, Fayzah Abdullah, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Norh A. Ahmed, Mutei Al Ghazali, Saba Al Harmi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Kawkab Al Malki, Somayah Al Najar, Naif Al Najar, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Saman Al-Gaad, Emtethal Al-Nomair, Hilal Al-Nomair, Saqr Al-Nomair, Amal Al-Okam, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Amr Aldaylam, Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Esmayl Algazali, Latifiya Algazali, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Nada Alghaithy, Faisal Algudari, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Nabila Alhanash, Majdy Alharbi, Abdelbaset Ali, Jamilah Ali, Etidal Alkuaif, Amal Almansouri, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Diana Arevalo, B.H.A., Amin El Burati, F.S., G.H.A., H.W.M.Q., H.W.M.Q. (2), Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Ahlam Hauter, Mar Abdo Kaid, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, M.A., M.M.N.A., Mansour Mohamed, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Kubla Moshin, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Suriah Mohamed Muthana, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Ghamdam Nasser, Mokhtar Nasser, Mohamed Qasem, Siham Rajeh, Tawfik Rajeh, Atef Rajeh, S.A., S.H.A., Abdasalam Saeed, Geab Saeed, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Abdo Ali Saleh, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Ali Abdo Saleh, Arwa Saleh, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Saeed Sharif, Ghaithah Sharoh, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Anhar Abdullah Taher, Hussein Ali Yafai, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Mona Abass Zabara (Goldberg, Julie)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. by A.A., A.R., Abdulrakib Abashaar, Fayzah Abdullah, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Norh A. Ahmed, Mutei Al Ghazali, Saba Al Harmi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Kawkab Al Malki, Somayah Al Najar, Naif Al Najar, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Saman Al-Gaad, Emtethal Al-Nomair, Hilal Al-Nomair, Saqr Al-Nomair, Amal Al-Okam, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Amr Aldaylam, Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Esmayl Algazali, Latifiya Algazali, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Nada Alghaithy, Faisal Algudari, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Nabila Alhanash, Majdy Alharbi, Abdelbaset Ali, Jamilah Ali, Etidal Alkuaif, Amal Almansouri, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Diana Arevalo, B.H.A., Amin El Burati, F.S., G.H.A., H.W.M.Q., H.W.M.Q. (2), Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Ahlam Hauter, Mar Abdo Kaid, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, M.A., M.M.N.A., Mansour Mohamed, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Kubla Moshin, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Suriah Mohamed Muthana, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Ghamdam Nasser, Mokhtar Nasser, Mohamed Qasem, Siham Rajeh, Tawfik Rajeh, Atef Rajeh, S.A., S.H.A., Abdasalam Saeed, Geab Saeed, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Abdo Ali Saleh, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Ali Abdo Saleh, Arwa Saleh, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Saeed Sharif, Ghaithah Sharoh, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Anhar Abdullah Taher, Hussein Ali Yafai, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Mona Abass Zabara (Goldberg, Julie)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. by A.A., A.R., Abdulrakib Abashaar, Fayzah Abdullah, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Norh A. Ahmed, Mutei Al Ghazali, Saba Al Harmi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Kawkab Al Malki, Somayah Al Najar, Naif Al Najar, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Saman Al-Gaad, Emtethal Al-Nomair, Hilal Al-Nomair, Saqr Al-Nomair, Amal Al-Okam, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Amr Aldaylam, Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Esmayl Algazali, Latifiya Algazali, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Nada Alghaithy, Faisal Algudari, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Nabila Alhanash, Majdy Alharbi, Abdelbaset Ali, Jamilah Ali, Etidal Alkuaif, Amal Almansouri, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Diana Arevalo, B.H.A., Amin El Burati, F.S., G.H.A., H.W.M.Q., H.W.M.Q. (2), Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Ahlam Hauter, Mar Abdo Kaid, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, M.A., M.M.N.A., Mansour Mohamed, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Kubla Moshin, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Suriah Mohamed Muthana, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Ghamdam Nasser, Mokhtar Nasser, Mohamed Qasem, Siham Rajeh, Tawfik Rajeh, Atef Rajeh, S.A., S.H.A., Abdasalam Saeed, Geab Saeed, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Abdo Ali Saleh, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Ali Abdo Saleh, Arwa Saleh, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Saeed Sharif, Ghaithah Sharoh, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Anhar Abdullah Taher, Hussein Ali Yafai, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Mona Abass Zabara (Goldberg, Julie)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. by A.A., A.R., Abdulrakib Abashaar, Fayzah Abdullah, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Norh A. Ahmed, Mutei Al Ghazali, Saba Al Harmi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Kawkab Al Malki, Somayah Al Najar, Naif Al Najar, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Saman Al-Gaad, Emtethal Al-Nomair, Hilal Al-Nomair, Saqr Al-Nomair, Amal Al-Okam, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Amr Aldaylam, Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Esmayl Algazali, Latifiya Algazali, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Nada Alghaithy, Faisal Algudari, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Nabila Alhanash, Majdy Alharbi, Abdelbaset Ali, Jamilah Ali, Etidal Alkuaif, Amal Almansouri, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Diana Arevalo, B.H.A., Amin El Burati, F.S., G.H.A., H.W.M.Q., H.W.M.Q. (2), Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Ahlam Hauter, Mar Abdo Kaid, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, M.A., M.M.N.A., Mansour Mohamed, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Kubla Moshin, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Suriah Mohamed Muthana, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Ghamdam Nasser, Mokhtar Nasser, Mohamed Qasem, Siham Rajeh, Tawfik Rajeh, Atef Rajeh, S.A., S.H.A., Abdasalam Saeed, Geab Saeed, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Abdo Ali Saleh, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Ali Abdo Saleh, Arwa Saleh, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Saeed Sharif, Ghaithah Sharoh, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Anhar Abdullah Taher, Hussein Ali Yafai, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Mona Abass Zabara (Goldberg, Julie)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Main Document 4 replaced on 2/25/2019) (Bowens, Priscilla).
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 11, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Nina Gershon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11189667. by A.A., A.R., Abdulrakib Abashaar, Fayzah Abdullah, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Norh A. Ahmed, Mutei Al Ghazali, Saba Al Harmi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Kawkab Al Malki, Somayah Al Najar, Naif Al Najar, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Saman Al-Gaad, Emtethal Al-Nomair, Hilal Al-Nomair, Saqr Al-Nomair, Amal Al-Okam, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Amr Aldaylam, Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Esmayl Algazali, Latifiya Algazali, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Nada Alghaithy, Faisal Algudari, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Nabila Alhanash, Majdy Alharbi, Abdelbaset Ali, Jamilah Ali, Etidal Alkuaif, Amal Almansouri, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Diana Arevalo, B.H.A., Amin El Burati, F.S., G.H.A., H.W.M.Q., H.W.M.Q. (2), Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Ahlam Hauter, Mar Abdo Kaid, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, M.A., M.M.N.A., Mansour Mohamed, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Kubla Moshin, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Suriah Mohamed Muthana, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Ghamdam Nasser, Mokhtar Nasser, Mohamed Qasem, Siham Rajeh, Tawfik Rajeh, Atef Rajeh, S.A., S.H.A., Abdasalam Saeed, Geab Saeed, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Abdo Ali Saleh, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Ali Abdo Saleh, Arwa Saleh, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Saeed Sharif, Ghaithah Sharoh, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Anhar Abdullah Taher, Hussein Ali Yafai, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Mona Abass Zabara. (Attachments: #1 Admission Information) (Goldberg, Julie)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number BNYEDC-11189617 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Ahlam Hauter, Abdulrakib Abashaar, Qublah Tahar Yahya, Amin El Burati, Amal Al-Okam, Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi, Alfiah Abod Ahmed, Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi, Hilal Al-Nomair, H.W.M.Q., Naif Al Najar, Wadlah Mohammed Saleh, Fayzah Abdullah, F.S., Suriah Mohamed Muthana, M.A., Emtethal Al-Nomair, Etidal Alkuaif, Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif, Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya, Ahmed Yahya Haimed, Arwa Saleh, Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan, Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi, Faisal Algudari, Ghamdam Nasser, Nada Alghaithy, Abdullah Ali Saleh, Abdo Ahmed Nasser, Hussein Ali Yafai, S.A., G.H.A., Anhar Abdullah Taher, A.A., Tawfik Rajeh, Jamilah Ali, Mohamed Al-Wajih, Atef Rajeh, H.W.M.Q. (2), Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi, Abdurahman Al Malki, Tawfik Al-Saidi, Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh, Somayah Al Najar, Mutei Al Ghazali, Samerah Ahmed Musa, Abdlarzak Mohsin, Yaha Amer Alhagag, Mohamed Taher Aldafri, Saba Al Harmi, M.M.N.A., Mona Abass Zabara, Abdasalam Saeed, Ali Alawi Almardaei, Suood Almerdaei, Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh, Shathia Abdo Alnaggar, Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee, Saqr Al-Nomair, Norh A. Ahmed, Mustafa Ahmed Yahya, Abdelbaset Ali, Diana Arevalo, Siham Rajeh, Geab Saeed, Kawkab Al Malki, B.H.A., Saeed Sharif, Mokhtar Nasser, Esmayl Algazali, Kubla Moshin, Mohamed Mutaher Kassem, A.R., Mar Abdo Kaid, Ali Abdo Saleh, Mohamed Qasem, Amr Aldaylam, Mansour Mohamed, S.H.A., Nabila Alhanash, Wafe Abdulla Saleh, Majdy Alharbi, Amal Almansouri, Saman Al-Gaad, Rasam Obaid Saeed, Ghaithah Sharoh, Latifiya Algazali, Abdo Ali Saleh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Goldberg, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Almerdaei et al v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mar Abdo Kaid
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saman Al-Gaad
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bahia Mohammed Ahmed Yahya
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saeed Sharif
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emtethal Al-Nomair
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faisal Algudari
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ghyath Absulrahman Saleh
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanan Fahmi Alghaithi
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.W.M.Q. (2)
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.H.A.
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wadlah Mohammed Saleh
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samerah Ahmed Musa
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamilah Ali
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mustafa Ahmed Yahya
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdlarzak Mohsin
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Taher Aldafri
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Majdy Alharbi
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siham Rajeh
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saqr Al-Nomair
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfiah Abod Ahmed
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdo Ahmed Nasser
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wazea Abdulkader Algaradi
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilal Al-Nomair
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amal Almansouri
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdelbaset Ali
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tawfik Al-Saidi
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amr Aldaylam
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yaha Amer Alhagag
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Mohamed Mutaher Kassem
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.H.A.
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asma Abdulhamid Al-Quhaif
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mutei Al Ghazali
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arwa Saleh
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Al-Wajih
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esmayl Algazali
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.A.
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nabila Alhanash
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latifiya Algazali
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nada Alghaithy
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdulrakib Abashaar
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kubla Moshin
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fayzah Abdullah
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geab Saeed
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdurahman Al Malki
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mokhtar Nasser
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waled Mohammed Al Nehmi
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suood Almerdaei
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Alawi Almardaei
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ghaithah Sharoh
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Somayah Al Najar
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Yahya Haimed
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saba Al Harmi
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahlam Hauter
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.M.N.A.
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.W.M.Q.
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Qasem
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naif Al Najar
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nakhla Saleh Hussein Saibaan
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.A.
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faiz Ali Al-Nomair
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norh A. Ahmed
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atef Rajeh
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ghamdam Nasser
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shathia Abdo Alnaggar
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wafe Abdulla Saleh
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mansour Mohamed
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F.S.
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tawfik Rajeh
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emad Nasr Abdulrab Nagi
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.R.
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meethak Abdullah Ali Saleh
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kawkab Al Malki
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hussein Ali Yafai
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suriah Mohamed Muthana
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Abdo Saleh
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.H.A.
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdasalam Saeed
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.A.
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nehmah Ahmed Shohatee
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mona Abass Zabara
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amal Al-Okam
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amin El Burati
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdullah Ali Saleh
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qublah Tahar Yahya
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Arevalo
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rasam Obaid Saeed
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdo Ali Saleh
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anhar Abdullah Taher
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Etidal Alkuaif
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Suryia Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin Kennington
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Represented By: Farzin Franklin Amanat
Represented By: Gisela Westwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Represented By: Farzin Franklin Amanat
Represented By: Gisela Westwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Nolan
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Represented By: Farzin Franklin Amanat
Represented By: Gisela Westwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trump J. Donald
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Represented By: Farzin Franklin Amanat
Represented By: Gisela Westwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Embassy in Djibouti
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Represented By: Farzin Franklin Amanat
Represented By: Gisela Westwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Pompeo
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Represented By: Farzin Franklin Amanat
Represented By: Gisela Westwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Coats
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Represented By: Farzin Franklin Amanat
Represented By: Gisela Westwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Represented By: Farzin Franklin Amanat
Represented By: Gisela Westwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chapman Godbey
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Represented By: Farzin Franklin Amanat
Represented By: Gisela Westwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Represented By: Farzin Franklin Amanat
Represented By: Gisela Westwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Represented By: Farzin Franklin Amanat
Represented By: Gisela Westwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security ("DHS")
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Represented By: Farzin Franklin Amanat
Represented By: Gisela Westwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Whitaker
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Represented By: Farzin Franklin Amanat
Represented By: Gisela Westwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?