Bone et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Janine Buckley, Christine Sawyer, Kelly Bone, Abraham Mejia, Bradley Mace, Christy Zisser, Brad Getz, Elisa Bindus, Jill Lanham, Nancy McAtee, Sherri Anderson, Cheryl Barr, Julie Hoffman, Patrick McDonald, Ada Darnell, Sarah Stroud, Penny Hopson, Simmons Chhamboni and Scott Molski
Defendant: John Does 1 - 10, Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. and Colgate-Palmolive Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00831
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 4/5/2019. (Marino, Janine)
April 3, 2019 Filing 17 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #13 Amended Complaint, by Colgate-Palmolive Company, Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Chanoine, Hannah Y)
March 13, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Related Case (Davis, Kimberly)
March 13, 2019 Filing 15 Proposed Summons. Re #13 Amended Complaint, by Sherri Anderson, Cheryl Barr, Elisa Bindus, Kelly Bone, Janine Buckley, Simmons Chhamboni, Ada Darnell, Brad Getz, Julie Hoffman, Penny Hopson, Jill Lanham, Bradley Mace, Nancy McAtee, Patrick McDonald, Abraham Mejia, Scott Molski, Christine Sawyer, Sarah Stroud, Christy Zisser (Tusa, Joseph)
March 13, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed Summons. Re #13 Amended Complaint, by Sherri Anderson, Cheryl Barr, Elisa Bindus, Kelly Bone, Janine Buckley, Simmons Chhamboni, Ada Darnell, Brad Getz, Julie Hoffman, Penny Hopson, Jill Lanham, Bradley Mace, Nancy McAtee, Patrick McDonald, Abraham Mejia, Scott Molski, Christine Sawyer, Sarah Stroud, Christy Zisser (Tusa, Joseph)
March 13, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT Amended Class Action Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Christine Sawyer, Kelly Bone, Janine Buckley, Simmons Chhamboni, Cheryl Barr, Scott Molski, Elisa Bindus, Brad Getz, Sherri Anderson, Abraham Mejia, Nancy McAtee, Jill Lanham, Christy Zisser, Penny Hopson, Ada Darnell, Julie Hoffman, Patrick McDonald, Sarah Stroud, Bradley Mace. (Tusa, Joseph)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc. answer due 4/5/2019; Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. answer due 4/5/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 3/7/2019. (Marino, Janine)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 3/6/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Consent Letter Motion Requesting a 30-day Extension of Defendants' Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint) by Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Chanoine, Hannah Y)
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Y Shay Chanoine on behalf of Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Chanoine, Hannah Y)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Bone, Janine Buckley, Christine Sawyer. Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc. served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Tusa, Joseph)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Bone, Janine Buckley, Christine Sawyer. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. served on 2/20/2019, answer due 3/13/2019. (Tusa, Joseph)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 COPY of Plaintiffs' Motion for Transfer of Actions to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Originally filed before the JPMDL. (Marziliano, August)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 HPN Sales summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 11, 2019 Case assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Kelly Bone, Janine Buckley, Christine Sawyer (Tusa, Joseph)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Kelly Bone, Janine Buckley, Christine Sawyer (Tusa, Joseph)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Kelly Bone, Janine Buckley, Christine Sawyer (Tusa, Joseph)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11189611 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Kelly Bone, Janine Buckley, Christine Sawyer. (Tusa, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bone et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Hannah Y Shay Chanoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Represented By: Hannah Y Shay Chanoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company
Represented By: Hannah Y Shay Chanoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janine Buckley
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Sawyer
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Bone
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Mejia
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Mace
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Zisser
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Getz
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisa Bindus
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Lanham
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy McAtee
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Anderson
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Barr
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Hoffman
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick McDonald
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ada Darnell
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Stroud
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Hopson
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simmons Chhamboni
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Molski
Represented By: Joseph S. Tusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?