Proctor v. Quinn

Plaintiff: Allen Proctor
Defendant: Doreen A. Quinn
Case Number: 1:2019cv00833
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Pamela K Chen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 Prisoner Account Statement as to Allen Proctor. (Barrett, C)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B), the complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted and because the sole Defendant is immune from suit; that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), any appeal would not be taken in good faith; and that in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of appeal. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 44445 (1962). Ordered by Clerk of Court, by Deputy Clerk Jalitza Poveda, on 2/20/2019. C/M w/Appeals Packet. (Barrett, C)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, the complaint is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted and because the sole Defendant is immune from suit. Because the facts alleged in the complaint make clear that Plaintiff cannot allege a viable 1983 claim against Defendant, the Court does not permit him to amend. See Russ v. Chavers, No. 10-cv-1370 (SLT) (JO), 2012 WL 170007, at *3 (E.D.N.Y Jan. 19, 2012) (denying pro se plaintiff leave to amend where all named defendants were immune from liability under 1983). The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith, and therefore, in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of appeal. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 44445 (1962). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment and close this case. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 2/19/2019. (Knapp, Cody)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (as amended July 26, 1996), plaintiff is proceeding in forma pauperis and must pay the total $350 fee by monthly installments deducted from plaintiff's prison trust fund account (or institutional equivalent). (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Allen Proctor. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Doreen A. Quinn, filed by Allen Proctor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Proctor v. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doreen A. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?