Zhu et al v. Nielsen et al

Plaintiff: Xiu Zhi Chen, Zi Han Zhu and Ren Feng Zhu
Defendant: Lee Francis Cissna, Donald Neufeld and Kirstjen Nielsen
Case Number: 1:2019cv00877
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Raymond J Dearie
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Lee Francis Cissna answer due 6/21/2019; Donald Neufeld answer due 6/21/2019; Kirstjen Nielsen answer due 6/21/2019. So Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 4/9/2019. (Almonte, Giselle)
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Lee Francis Cissna, Donald Neufeld, Kirstjen Nielsen. (Laserna, Peter)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ren Feng Zhu, Zi Han Zhu, Xiu Zhi Chen. Donald Neufeld served on 2/15/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (Lee, Corey)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ren Feng Zhu, Zi Han Zhu, Xiu Zhi Chen. Lee Francis Cissna served on 2/15/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (Lee, Corey)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ren Feng Zhu, Zi Han Zhu, Xiu Zhi Chen. Kirstjen Nielsen served on 2/15/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (Lee, Corey)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter A Laserna on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Laserna, Peter)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 14, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Raymond J. Dearie. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lee Francis Cissna, Donald Neufeld, Kirstjen Nielsen filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11198944 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Ren Feng Zhu, Zi Han Zhu, Xiu Zhi Chen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Lee, Corey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zhu et al v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Francis Cissna
Represented By: Peter A Laserna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Neufeld
Represented By: Peter A Laserna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Peter A Laserna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiu Zhi Chen
Represented By: Corey T Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zi Han Zhu
Represented By: Corey T Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ren Feng Zhu
Represented By: Corey T Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?