Valentine v. Westchester County et al

Plaintiff: Vashawn Valentine
Defendant: New Rochelle Police Department, Westchester County and Westchester County of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2019cv00884
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 CASE: 1:19-cv-00884 DETAILS: Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in Southern District of New York as case 1:19-cv-02526, filed 03/21/2019. (Marziliano, August)
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 TRANSFER ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached transfer order, in the interest of justice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), this action is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. A ruling on Plaintiffs application to proceed in forma pauperis is reserved for the transferee court. That provision of Rule 83.1 of the Local Rules of the Eastern District of New York which requires a seven-day delay is waived. No summons shall issue from this Court. (C/mailed to Pro Se Litigant) (Ramesar, Thameera)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Vashawn Valentine. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New Rochelle Police Department, Westchester County, Westchester County of Corrections, filed by Vashawn Valentine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valentine v. Westchester County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vashawn Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Rochelle Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester County of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?