Landstar, Inc. v. Hubai Chuguan Industry Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: LANDSTAR, INC and Landstar, Inc.
Defendant: MADISON STOCK TRANSFER INC., HUBAI CHUGUAN INDUSTRY CO, LTD and Hubai Chuguan Industry Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01121
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Hubai Chuguan Industry Co., Ltd.. (Sayid, Mustafa)
April 8, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Hubai Chuguan Industry Co., Ltd.. (Sayid, Mustafa)
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Stipulation extending defendant Hubai Chuguan Industry Co., Ltd's time to answer by Landstar, Inc. (Fleischmann, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/29/2019 (Graham, Emily).
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Hubai Chuguan Industry Co., Ltd. Answer due 4/22/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 3/29/2019. (Graham, Emily)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER: In light of #11 , the Initial Conference is adjourned to 5/16/2019 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 3/29/2019. (Graham, Emily)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 4/22/2019 @ 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 3/21/2019. (Caggiano, Diana)
March 20, 2019 Filing 9 First ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Nominal Defendant by Madison Stock Transfer Inc.. (Shichtman, Marshal)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Madison summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 25, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet.. by LANDSTAR, INC (Fleischmann, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by LANDSTAR, INC (Fleischmann, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by LANDSTAR, INC (Fleischmann, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LANDSTAR, INC (Fleischmann, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HUBAI CHUGUAN INDUSTRY CO, LTD, MADISON STOCK TRANSFER INC. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11230773 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by LANDSTAR, INC. (Fleischmann, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landstar, Inc. v. Hubai Chuguan Industry Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MADISON STOCK TRANSFER INC.
Represented By: Marshal D. Shichtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUBAI CHUGUAN INDUSTRY CO, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubai Chuguan Industry Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Mustafa David Sayid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LANDSTAR, INC
Represented By: Jeffrey Fleischmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landstar, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Fleischmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?