Suris v. TMZ Productions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Yaroslav Suris
Defendant: Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., TMZ Productions, Inc., EHM Productions, Inc. and John Doe Corporations and Limited Liability Companies 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv01417
Filed: March 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Pamela K Chen
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yaroslav Suris. Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. served on 3/25/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (Segal, Mitchell)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Yaroslav Suris. EHM Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019; John Doe Corporations and Limited Liability Companies 1-10 waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019; TMZ Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019; Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (Segal, Mitchell)
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 12, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 12, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ehm Productions, Inc. d/b/a Tmz d/b/a Tmz.com, John Doe Corporations and Limited Liability Companies 1-10, Tmz Productions, Inc. d/b/a/ Tmz d/b/a Tmz.com, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11277913 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Yaroslav Suris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Segal, Mitchell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suris v. TMZ Productions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TMZ Productions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EHM Productions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations and Limited Liability Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yaroslav Suris
Represented By: Mitchell Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?