Integon National Insurance Company As Reinsurer for Tower Insurance Company of New York v. Sypa et al

Plaintiff: Integon National Insurance Company As Reinsurer for Tower Insurance Company of New York
Defendant: Steven Sypa and Frances Bongiorno
Case Number: 1:2019cv02714
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: William F Kuntz
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, All Defendants. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 6/13/2019. (Kuntz, William)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Integon National Insurance Company As Reinsurer for Tower Insurance Company of New York. (Siegel, Lee)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Integon National Insurance Company As Reinsurer for Tower Insurance Company of New York. Frances Bongiorno served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Siegel, Lee)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 2:00 P.M. on 8/2/2019 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. All counsel must attend. Plaintiff is directed to notify Defendant of this scheduling order at the time that Defendant makes an appearance in this matter. Counsel are also directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 8/2/2019. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 6/3/2019. (Manson, Eddie) .
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Integon National Insurance Company As Reinsurer for Tower Insurance Company of New York. Steven Sypa served on 5/27/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Siegel, Lee)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Frances Bongiorno, Steven Sypa. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11461002 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Integon National Insurance Company As Reinsurer for Tower Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Siegel, Lee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Integon National Insurance Company As Reinsurer for Tower Insurance Company of New York v. Sypa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Sypa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances Bongiorno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Integon National Insurance Company As Reinsurer for Tower Insurance Company of New York
Represented By: Lee S. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?