In the Matter of: Constantinos Charidemou, as Owner of a 1994 33-foot Sea Ray recreational vessel, for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability
Petitioner: Constantinos Charidemou
Case Number: 1:2019cv02724
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Referring Judge: Steven M Gold
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability. Notice is hereby given to all persons, firms, entities or corporations having any claim or suit against the petitioner or his vessel with respect to which the Complaint seeks exoneration from or limitation of liability, directing that all claims be filed with the Clerk of this Court and delivered or mailed to attorneys for petitioner, as set forth herein, on or before the 30th day of August, 2019. Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court, by Brenna B. Mahoney, Chief Deputy. (Mahoney, Brenna)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, that the above-described Ad Interim Stipulation for Value, with interestas aforesaid, filed by petitioner for the benefit of any and all claimants as security representing the petitioner's interest in the value of the vessel as of the date of the alleged incident, be and is hereby approved; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court, only upon motion and good cause shown, shall cause appraisal of the value of petitioner's interest in the vessel on the date of the alleged incident, and may thereupon order said security increased or reduced if it finds the amount thereof insufficient or excessive...See Order for further ruling. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 6/6/2019. (Lee, Tiffeny)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability against Constantinos Charidemou filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11462457 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Constantinos Charidemou. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Valuation, #2 Exhibit "B" LOU, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Notice, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Poling, Kristin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of: Constantinos Charidemou, as Owner of a 1994 33-foot Sea Ray recreational vessel, for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Constantinos Charidemou
Represented By: Kristin Eileen Poling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?