Post v. Wolin et al
Plaintiff: John Post
Defendant: Lisa N. Colleran, Mark H. Ravich, Robert L. Chioini, Ronald D. Boyd, Thomas E. Klema, Benjamin Wolin, Patrick J. Bagley, Rockwell Medical, Inc., John G. Cooper and Robin L. Smith
Case Number: 1:2019cv02774
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Referring Judge: Allyne R Ross
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Consolidating the Related Stockholder Derivative Actions and Appointing Lead and Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs by John Post (Sanders, Shane)ADDED EVENT TYPE MOTION to Consolidate Cases on 6/14/2019 (Vertus, Miriam).
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #20 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 6/14/2019. (Vertus, Miriam)
June 14, 2019 Case Consolidated., Cases associated with lead case 1:19-cv-02373-ARR-RER Le Clair v. Wolin et al. (Vertus, Miriam)
June 4, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr.: Telephone Conference held on 6/4/2019. Appearances stated on the record. Discussions held. Parties are directed to file an agreed upon schedule, a stipulation to consolidate the Complaints and an agreement as to service in 1:19-cv-02373 and 1:19-cv-02774 by 6/14/2019. Initial Conference set for 6/27/2019 is adjourned sine die. (FTR Log #2:00:18-2:10:27 (208N)) (Several, Emily)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 6/4/2019 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. The parties are directed to use the Toll free number 1-888-684-8852 and Access Code 5496961# to participate in the scheduled telephone conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 5/20/2019. (Vertus, Miriam)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Brian M. Cogan no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 5/20/2019. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 2:30 PM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/17/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
May 16, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Related Case (Davis, Kimberly)
May 16, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Patrick J. Bagley, Ronald D. Boyd, Robert L. Chioini, Lisa N. Colleran, John G. Cooper, Thomas E. Klema, Mark H. Ravich, Rockwell Medical, Inc., Robin L. Smith, Benjamin Wolin. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 16, 2019 Filing 16 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 16, 2019 Filing 15 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 15, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by John Post (Amon, Thomas)
May 15, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by John Post (Amon, Thomas)
May 15, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by John Post (Amon, Thomas)
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by John Post (Amon, Thomas)
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by John Post (Amon, Thomas)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by John Post (Amon, Thomas)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by John Post (Amon, Thomas)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by John Post (Amon, Thomas)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by John Post (Amon, Thomas)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by John Post (Amon, Thomas)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBIT B by John Post. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by John Post. (Amon, Thomas)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT A by John Post. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by John Post. (Amon, Thomas)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by John Post (Amon, Thomas)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11469448 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by John Post. (Amon, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Post v. Wolin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Post
Represented By: Thomas G. Amon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa N. Colleran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark H. Ravich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Chioini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald D. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E. Klema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Wolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. Bagley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John G. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?