Selvaggio v. Hiatt et al

Plaintiff: Christina A. Selvaggio
Defendant: Lawrence Mansour, Rachel Adams, Robert Hiatt, Larry Mansour and Barbara Panepinto
Case Number: 1:2019cv02785
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the Complaint is dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), any appeal would not be taken in good faith; and that in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. ORDERED by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court, on 5/23/2019. (Copy of this Judgment and the attached appeals packet sent to pro se Plaintiff via first class mail.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM & ORDER [DISMISSING CASE]: Finding that Plaintiff is not likely to succeed on the merits in this action, on 5/13/2019, the Court denied Plaintiff's #2 application for injunctive relief. (Minute Entry dated 5/13/2019.) The Court grants Plaintiff's #3 application to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) for the purpose of this Memorandum and Order. By letter dated 5/19/2019, Plaintiff moved to withdraw her Complaint. Notwithstanding Plaintiff's #5 letter, the Court explains its reasons for dismissing the Complaint. Accordingly, the Court dismisses the Complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED by Judge Margo K. Brodie, on 5/22/2019. C/mailed. (Forwarded for Judgment.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 Letter MOTION to Withdraw Complaint by Christina A. Selvaggio. (Piper, Francine)
May 13, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Margo K. Brodie:Order to Show Cause hearing held before Judge Margo K. Brodie on May 13, 2019. Christina A. Selvaggio appeared pro se; defendants did not appear. The Court heard from Plaintiff on her #2 application for a temporary restraining order or preliminary injunction. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court denies Plaintiff's application for injunctive relief because she is not likely to succeed on the merits. (Court Reporter David Roy.) (Morel, Christopher)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Williams, Erica)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christina A. Selvaggio. (Williams, Erica)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Unsigned Order to Show Cause by Christina A. Selvaggio (Williams, Erica)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rachel Adams, Robert Hiatt, Lawrence Mansour, Barbara Panepinto, filed by Christina A. Selvaggio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Williams, Erica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selvaggio v. Hiatt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Mansour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hiatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Mansour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Panepinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina A. Selvaggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?