Tanase v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Nicholae Tanase
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv02906
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean P. Greene on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (aty to be noticed) (Greene, Sean)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Defendant shall proceed promptly to obtain the administrative record of the proceedings below, and shall file the record or otherwise move against the complaint by the date set forth below, unless an extension is granted by order of the Court for good cause. Defendant shall file the administrative record, which will constitute Defendant's answer, or otherwise move against the complain by August 19, 2019. Plaintiff shall serve Defendant with his motion for judgment on the pleadings by October 18, 2019. Defendant shall serve Plaintiff with its response to Defendant's motion, which must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and underlying administrative proceedings, by December 17, 2019; and Plaintiff shall serve Defendant with his reply, if any, by January 7, 2020. SO ORDERED by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall, on May 21, 2019. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
May 20, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11486532 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Nicholae Tanase. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Skovronsky, Harold)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tanase v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholae Tanase
Represented By: Harold Skovronsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Sean P. Greene
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?