Jeter-Jemmott v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Regina Jeter-Jemmott
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2019cv02961
Filed: May 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Pamela K Chen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Mailloux on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (aty to be noticed) (Mailloux, Matthew)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Defendant shall file the administrative record, which will constitute Defendant's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint by 8/19/2019. Plaintiff shall file and serve a motion for judgment on the pleadings by 10/18/2019. Defendant shall file and serve its response to Plaintiff's motion, which response must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and underlying administrative proceedings, by 12/17/2019. Plaintiff shall file and serve a reply, if any, by 1/7/2020. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 5/21/2019. (Abdallah, Fida)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 19, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill filing fee $ 400, receipt number BNYEDC-11493577 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Regina Jeter-Jemmott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Bowes, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeter-Jemmott v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Jeter-Jemmott
Represented By: Christopher James Bowes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Represented By: Matthew Mailloux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?