Ingianni v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Dawn Ingianni
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv03008
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 Letter to the Honorable Roslynn R. Mauskopf, to notify the court that the undersigned has not identified any recusal issues related to this case by Commissioner of Social Security (Olds, Dara)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Dara A Olds on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (aty to be noticed) (Olds, Dara)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER, granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SO ORDERED by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf, on 7/8/2019. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Within fifteen (15) days of the date of this Order, defendant shall comply with this Court's Standing Order dated November 1, 2009, requiring identification of any recusal issue(s), in the event that defendant has not yet complied with such Standing Order. Defendant shall obtain and serve upon plaintiff the administrative record of the proceedings, which shall constitute defendant's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint within ninety (90) days of the commencement of this action. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, plaintiff shall serve on defendant a motion for judgment on the pleadings within sixty (60) days of the defendant serving the administrative record. Defendant shall serve on plaintiff its response, which must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and underlying administrative proceedings, within sixty (60) days of service of plaintiffs motion for judgment on the pleadings. Plaintiff shall serve on defendant any reply, and shall also file with the Court the entire set of motion papers, the stipulation of fact discussed in paragraph 4 herein, and the administrative record within twenty-one (21) days of service of defendant's response. SO ORDERED by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf, on 7/8/2019. C/mailed. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summon) (Davis, Kimberly)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dawn Ingianni. (Olinsky, Howard)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Dawn Ingianni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Letter to Clerk, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons) (Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingianni v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Dara A Olds
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Ingianni
Represented By: Howard D. Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?