Charles v. Slade Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jean Marc Charles
Defendant: Slade Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03013
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Referring Judge: Steven M Gold
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 Letter cover letter serving courtesy copy of opposition papers on plaintiff by Slade Industries, Inc. (Bryan, Catherine)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 Letter requesting oral argument of plaintiff's motion to remand by Slade Industries, Inc. (Bryan, Catherine)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: In light of the motion to remand, the initial conference previously scheduled for July 26, 2019 is adjourned without date. Counsel shall immediately file a request to restore the conference to the Court's calendar should the case survive the motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 6/24/2019. (Gillespie, Saudia)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The court has received Plaintiff's #9 Motion to Remand. Defendant shall serve its response by no later than July 12, 2019. Plaintiff shall serve his reply, if any, and file the fully briefed motion by no later than July 26, 2019. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 6/24/2019. (Davis, Eleanor)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 Letter requesting oral argument of motion to remand by Jean Marc Charles (Koenigsberg, Paul)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jean Marc Charles. (Koenigsberg, Paul)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Weiss on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Weiss, Richard)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Koenigsberg on behalf of All Plaintiffs (notification declined or already on case) (Koenigsberg, Paul)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 3:00 p.m. on July 26, 2019 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for defendant is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with plaintiff's counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Perri J. Koll on behalf of Slade Industries, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Koll, Perri)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 21, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Slade Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Schindler Enterprises, Inc. for Slade Industries, Inc.. (Bryan, Catherine)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Slade Industries, Inc. from Kings County Supreme, case number 507166/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11501368) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Summons and Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service upon Slade, #3 Exhibit Slade's Answer, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Response to Demand for Total Damages, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #7 Notice to Adverse Party) (Bryan, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles v. Slade Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slade Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine G. Bryan
Represented By: Perri J. Koll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Marc Charles
Represented By: Paul Koenigsberg
Represented By: Richard S. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?