Morris v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Antoinette Morris
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv03047
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court grants in part and denies in part the Commissioner's request for an extension of time: the administrative record shall be served and filed on or before August 7, 2019; the Commissioner's motion shall be served on or before October 7, 2019; plaintiff's opposition shall be served on or before November 7, 2019; and the Commissioner's reply, if any, shall be served and filed on or before November 21, 2019. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 7/7/2019 (Morel, Christopher)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File administrative record and respectfully requesting approval of the proposed amended briefing schedule by Commissioner of Social Security. (Olds, Dara)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dara A Olds on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (aty to be noticed) (Olds, Dara)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Courtesy copies of the Summons, the Court's Order and Plaintiff's Complaint sent to the United States Attorney General; United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York; and General Counsel at SSA.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff is granted #2 leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The United States Marshals Service is directed to serve the summons and complaint upon Defendant without prepayment of fees. Defendant shall proceed promptly to obtain the administrative record of the proceedings below, and shall file the record by the date set forth below, unless an extension is granted by order of the Court for good cause. Defendant shall file the administrative record, which will constitute Defendant's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint on or before 7/8/2019. Defendant shall file and serve a motion for judgment on the pleadings, which must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and administrative record, by 8/8/2019. Plaintiff shall file and serve a response to Defendant's motion, and any cross- motion, by 8/22/2019; and Defendant shall file and serve its reply, if any, by 9/5/2019. SO ORDERED by Judge Margo K. Brodie, on 6/4/2019. C/mailed. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie for all further proceedings. Judge Eric N. Vitaliano no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 5/24/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Williams, Erica)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Antoinette Morris. (Williams, Erica)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Antoinette Morris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Williams, Erica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Represented By: Dara A Olds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?