Geovanny Chillogallo Rodriguez et al v. Lalo Drywall Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Himmer Abel Oliveros Martinez, Franklin Geovanny Chillogallo Rodriguez, Klever Sinchi Quizhpi and Freddy Jesus Soriano Sanchez
Defendant: Lalo Drywall Inc., Mauro Chavez, Hudson Meridian Construction Group LLC, Jose Anaya, Sergio Raymundo and Luis E. Martinez
Case Number: 1:2019cv03112
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: On June 27, 2019, Defendant filed a letter #8 requesting a pre-motion conference regarding its anticipated motion to dismiss. In contravention of the Court's Individual Practices, Plaintiffs failed to respond to Defendant's request. Plaintiffs are directed to file a letter responding to Defendant's request, or indicating that they do not intend to oppose Defendant's motion. Any response must not exceed three pages and must be filed on or before July 11, 2019. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of this matter for failure to prosecute. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 7/17/2019. (Purdy, Kandice)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Bernstein on behalf of Hudson Meridian Construction Group LLC, William I. Cote (aty to be noticed) (Bernstein, Daniel)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re #1 Complaint,, to file Motion to Dismiss by Hudson Meridian Construction Group LLC, William I. Cote. (Margello, Sharon)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Klever Sinchi Quizhpi, Himmer Abel Oliveros Martinez, Freddy Jesus Soriano Sanchez, Jose Baudilio Zuniga Alvarenga, Franklin Geovanny Chillogallo Rodriguez, Kevin Dubon. Hudson Meridian Construction Group LLC served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Faillace, Michael)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Klever Sinchi Quizhpi, Himmer Abel Oliveros Martinez, Freddy Jesus Soriano Sanchez, Jose Baudilio Zuniga Alvarenga, Franklin Geovanny Chillogallo Rodriguez, Kevin Dubon. Lalo Drywall Inc. served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Faillace, Michael)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gennadiy Naydenskiy on behalf of Himmer Abel Oliveros Martinez, Jose Baudilio Zuniga Alvarenga, Kevin Dubon, Franklin Geovanny Chillogallo Rodriguez, Freddy Jesus Soriano Sanchez, Klever Sinchi Quizhpi (aty to be noticed) (Naydenskiy, Gennadiy)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summon, #2 Summon, #3 Summon, #4 Summon, #5 Summon, #6 Summon) (Davis, Kimberly)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jose Anaya, Mauro Chavez, Luis E. Martinez, Hudson Meridian Construction Group LLC, William I. Cote, Lalo Drywall Inc., Sergio Raymundo filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11514166 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Klever Sinchi Quizhpi, Himmer Abel Oliveros Martinez, Freddy Jesus Soriano Sanchez, Jose Baudilio Zuniga Alvarenga, Franklin Geovanny Chillogallo Rodriguez, Kevin Dubon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons) (Faillace, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geovanny Chillogallo Rodriguez et al v. Lalo Drywall Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lalo Drywall Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mauro Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Meridian Construction Group LLC
Represented By: Sharon P. Margello
Represented By: Daniel M. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Anaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio Raymundo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis E. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Himmer Abel Oliveros Martinez
Represented By: Michael A. Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Geovanny Chillogallo Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael A. Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klever Sinchi Quizhpi
Represented By: Michael A. Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddy Jesus Soriano Sanchez
Represented By: Michael A. Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?