Candelario et al v. GEICO Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Audrey Candelario, Laura Habberfield, Gregory Sharofsky, Peter Barlow and Brian Stiehler
Defendant: GEICO Corporation, GEICO General Insurance Company, Government Employees Insurance Company and GEICO Indemnity Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv03349
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Pamela K Chen
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against GEICO Corporation, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company, filed by Gregory Sharofsky, Audrey Candelario, Laura Habberfield, Peter Barlow, Brian Stiehler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Ferri, Daniel)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gregory Sharofsky, Audrey Candelario, Laura Habberfield, Peter Barlow, Brian Stiehler. GEICO Corporation waiver sent on 6/6/2019, answer due 8/5/2019; GEICO General Insurance Company waiver sent on 6/6/2019, answer due 8/5/2019; GEICO Indemnity Company waiver sent on 6/6/2019, answer due 8/5/2019; Government Employees Insurance Company waiver sent on 6/6/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Ferri, Daniel)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Ferri on behalf of Peter Barlow, Audrey Candelario, Laura Habberfield, Gregory Sharofsky, Brian Stiehler (notification declined or already on case) (Ferri, Daniel)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Solomon Nematzadeh on behalf of Peter Barlow, Audrey Candelario, Laura Habberfield, Gregory Sharofsky, Brian Stiehler (notification declined or already on case) (Nematzadeh, Justin)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 7/26/2019. (Marino, Janine)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11698707. by Peter Barlow, Audrey Candelario, Laura Habberfield, Gregory Sharofsky, Brian Stiehler. (Ferri, Daniel)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 5, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Peter Barlow, Audrey Candelario, Laura Habberfield, Gregory Sharofsky, Brian Stiehler (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Nematzadeh, Justin)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GEICO Corporation, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11548240 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Gregory Sharofsky, Audrey Candelario, Laura Habberfield, Peter Barlow, Brian Stiehler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Nematzadeh, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Candelario et al v. GEICO Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Candelario
Represented By: Justin Solomon Nematzadeh
Represented By: Daniel Ferri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Habberfield
Represented By: Justin Solomon Nematzadeh
Represented By: Daniel Ferri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Sharofsky
Represented By: Justin Solomon Nematzadeh
Represented By: Daniel Ferri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Barlow
Represented By: Justin Solomon Nematzadeh
Represented By: Daniel Ferri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Stiehler
Represented By: Justin Solomon Nematzadeh
Represented By: Daniel Ferri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?